Redfern v. Diamond Resorts Management Incorporated

Plaintiff: Gregory Redfern
Defendant: Diamond Resorts Management Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv02433
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - Having reviewed the #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned matter is dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/20/19. (MSA)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Robert John Heieck. (Heieck, Robert)
June 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gregory Redfern. (Heieck, Robert)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 *NOTICE re: AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Diamond Resorts Management Incorporated filed by Gregory Redfern. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint (Strikethrough), #2 Amended Complaint (Clean), #3 Redacted Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Redacted Exhibit 7 & 8, #10 Amended Exhibit 9, #11 Amended Exhibit 10, #12 Amended Exhibit 11, #13 Amended Exhibit 12)(Heieck, Robert) *Modified event and text on 6/13/2019 (REK).
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Stipulation for Plaintiff to Amend Complaint #12 is granted. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint no later than June 12, 2019, and Defendant shall respond to the Amended Complaint no later than July 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/11/2019. (REK)
June 5, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Brian P Parker on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Amend Complaint and Proposed Schedule by Gregory Redfern. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heieck, Robert)
May 29, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Douglas A Vonderhaar on behalf of defendant. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 29, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Albert G Lin on behalf of defendant. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 5/31/2019 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/22/2019. (MMO)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT Or Otherwise Respond by Diamond Resorts Management Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order to Extend Def's Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint)(Gardner, Jeffrey)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gregory Redfern: Proof of Service upon Diamond Resorts Management, Inc. on 05/01/2019. (Heieck, Robert)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Exhibits 1-8 by Plaintiff Gregory Redfern. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibits 7-8)(Heieck, Robert)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY ORDER: A motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service no later than 7/15/2019. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on 7/15/2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(LMR)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Diamond Resorts Management Incorporated. (MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16790401. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2433-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Gregory Redfern. (Heieck, Robert)(MFR)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16790401 filed by Gregory Redfern. (Heieck, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redfern v. Diamond Resorts Management Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Redfern
Represented By: Robert John Heieck
Represented By: Brian Parker
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts Management Incorporated
Represented By: Douglas Allen Vonderhaar
Represented By: Jeffrey Dale Gardner
Represented By: Albert G Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?