Office Resale Solutions LLC v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Office Resale Solutions LLC
Defendant: Owners Insurance Company and Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02471
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 1/10/2020. Dispositive motions due by 3/10/2020. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/11/2019. (LMR)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Rule 16 Case Management Conference, presently set for June 21, 2019 before Honorable Steven P. Logan, is vacated. Order to follow. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/11/2019. (LMR)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) , prepared jointly, filed by Plaintiff Office Resale Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Christoffel, David)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Stipulated Motion to Continue Case Management Conference #13 is denied. See order for details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/5/2019. (LMR)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing of June 21, 2019 by Office Resale Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Christoffel, David)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE re: Attorney vacation letter by Office Resale Solutions LLC . (Christoffel, David)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Barrett, Kevin)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #9 Notice (Other) filed by Office Resale Solutions LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMP)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Notice of Service by Office Resale Solutions LLC re: #6 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 1)(Christoffel, David)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference is set for 6/21/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(LMR)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Owners Insurance Company.(Barrett, Kevin)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY ORDER: A motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(LMR)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Office Resale Solutions LLC. (KAH)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAH)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16800083. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2471-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Owners Insurance Company. (Barrett, Kevin) (KAH)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-002728. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16800083 filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Barrett, Kevin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental, #3 Exhibit A) (KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Office Resale Solutions LLC v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin Charles Barrett
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Bahling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin Charles Barrett
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Bahling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Office Resale Solutions LLC
Represented By: David Andrew Christoffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?