Loria v. Universal Background Screening Incorporated

Plaintiff: Micheal Loria
Defendant: Universal Background Screening Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv02482
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Universal Background Screening Incorporated identifying Pluto Acquisition OpCo LLC, Pluto Acquisition HoldCo LLC, Pluto Acquisition TopCo LLC, Sackett National Holdings Inc as corporate parties. (Healy, Sean) *Modified to add corporate parties on 7/1/2019 (EJA).
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Universal Background Screening Incorporated.(Healy, Sean)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting the #9 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (First Request), and a one-time extension of time until 6/29/2019 for Defendant to respond to the complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/3/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint (First Request) by Universal Background Screening Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healy, Sean)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 7/29/2019 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order upon Defendant and file notice of service. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/14/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Micheal Loria: Return of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Daniel Shoemaker, CEO on 05/08/2019. (Kent, Trinette) *Modified to list additional document served on 5/14/2019 (REK).
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/18/2019. (LFIG)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Universal Background Screening Incorporated. (DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16801936. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2482-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Micheal Loria. (Kent, Trinette) (DLC)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16801936 filed by Micheal Loria. (Kent, Trinette) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loria v. Universal Background Screening Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micheal Loria
Represented By: Trinette G Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Background Screening Incorporated
Represented By: Sean Patrick Healy
Represented By: Zachary Robert Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?