Ovono Eyuima v. Keeton

Petitioner: Miguel Angel Ngui Ovono Eyuima
Respondent: Chuck Keeton
Case Number: 2:2019cv02485
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine (PS)
Referring Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Alien Detainee - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Miguel Angel Ngui Ovono Eyuima. (2 pages) (RMV)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number PHX208247. (RMV)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner. The Clerk of Court must mail Petitioner the court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Habeas). See document for complete details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/29/2019. (RMV)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (RMV)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Miguel Angel Ngui Ovono Eyuima. (59 pages)(RMV) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2019: #1 Pages 56, 57, 58 rescanned) (SLQ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ovono Eyuima v. Keeton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chuck Keeton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miguel Angel Ngui Ovono Eyuima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?