Melvin v. TransUnion Credit Bureau et al

Plaintiff: Miles A Melvin
Defendant: TransUnion Credit Bureau, Experian Credit Bureau, Equifax Credit Bureau, Experian Information Solutions Incorporated, Equifax Credit Information Services and TransUnion LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02499
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Referring Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Trans Union LLC's #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension is granted. Defendant's Joinder in Defendant Equifax Information Service LLC's #15 Motion to Dismiss is deemed timely filed. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/5/2019. (MMO)
July 2, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Experian Credit Bureau. (Javadizadeh, Sheereen)
June 17, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant TransUnion Credit Bureau. (Masog, Miles)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 2/24/2020. Dispositive motions due by 4/16/2020. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/13/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER vacating the Rule 16 Case Management Conference, presently set for June 21, 2019 before Honorable Steven P. Logan. Order to follow. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/13/2019. (LFIG)
June 11, 2019 Filing 22 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Defendant Experian Credit Bureau. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Case Management Order)(Javadizadeh, Sheereen)
May 31, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Equifax Credit Bureau. (Hubbard, Maria)
May 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Experian Credit Bureau. (Javadizadeh, Sheereen)
May 16, 2019 Filing 19 Joinder re: #13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant TransUnion Credit Bureau. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record Certification of Meet and Confer) (Masog, Miles) *Modified linkage on 5/17/2019 (DXD).
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference is set for 6/21/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(LMR)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(LMR)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED this case be reassigned, by lot, to another judge in the District of Arizona. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable Steven P. Logan. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-19-02499-PHX-SPL. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating any pending hearings to be reset by the newly assigned division. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/29/19. (CLB)
April 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Equifax Credit Bureau. (Hubbard, Maria)
April 24, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TransUnion Credit Bureau identifying Corporate Parent Trans Union LLC, TransUnion Intermediate Holdings Incorporated, TransUnion and T. Rowe Price Group Incorporated for TransUnion Credit Bureau. (Masog, Miles) *Modified record on 4/25/2019 (DXD).
April 24, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by TransUnion Credit Bureau. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT)(Masog, Miles)
April 24, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Credit Bureau identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Credit Bureau. (Javadizadeh, Sheereen)
April 24, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Sheereen Javadizadeh on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/19/2019. (MMO)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/19/2019. (MMO)
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 Additional Attachments to Main Document Civil Cover Sheet re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Equifax Credit Bureau. (Hubbard, Maria) *Modified text on 4/22/2019 (DXD).
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (DLC)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to TransUnion Credit Bureau. (DLC)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Experian Credit Bureau. (DLC)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Equifax Credit Bureau. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file correct document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16805820. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2499-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Credit Bureau. (Hubbard, Maria) (DLC)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Justice Court - Kyrene Justice Court, case number CC2019061860RC. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16805820 filed by Equifax Credit Bureau. (Hubbard, Maria) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A & B)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melvin v. TransUnion Credit Bureau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion Credit Bureau
Represented By: William W Drury, Jr.
Represented By: Miles Masog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Credit Bureau
Represented By: Sheereen Javadizadeh
Represented By: Emily Gildar Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Credit Bureau
Represented By: Melissa S Ho
Represented By: Maria Fernanda Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Incorporated
Represented By: Sheereen Javadizadeh
Represented By: Emily Gildar Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Credit Information Services
Represented By: Melissa S Ho
Represented By: Maria Fernanda Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion LLC
Represented By: William W Drury, Jr.
Represented By: Miles Masog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miles A Melvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?