Feffer v. BOKF NA

Plaintiff: Stanley A Feffer
Defendant: BOKF NA
Case Number: 2:2019cv02559
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Referring Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BOKF NA.(Levine, Paul)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE set for 8/2/2019 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/28/19. (MSA)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by BOKF NA: Acceptance of Service re: Complaint upon BOKF on 05/28/2019. (Levine, Paul)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - The Clerk shall terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 7/19/2019. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/6/19. (DXD)
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge G. Murray Snow. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-2559-PHX-GMS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BOKF NA. (KAH). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAH)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16811979. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-02559-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (KAH)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Stanley A Feffer. (Hippensteel, Jacob) (KAH)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16811979 filed by Stanley A Feffer. (Hippensteel, Jacob) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feffer v. BOKF NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley A Feffer
Represented By: Jacob Wayne Hippensteel
Represented By: Kevin Fallon McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOKF NA
Represented By: Paul M Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?