Wood et al v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Marla Wood and Troy Wood
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company and Unified Investigative & Sciences Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv02577
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Unified's motion for summary disposition (Doc. #10 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Unified's motion to dismiss (Doc. #9 ) is granted. Unified is dismissed from the above-captioned action without prejudice [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 6/24/19. (MAW)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 *AMENDED by Doc. #12 * ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Unified's motion for summary disposition (Doc. #11 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Unified's motion to dismiss (Doc. #10 ) is granted. Unified is dismissed from the above-captioned action without prejudice [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 6/21/19. (MAW) Modified on 6/24/2019 (MAW).
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 *MOTION for Ruling (Summary Disposition) re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Unified Investigative & Sciences Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hedberg, Kelly) *Modified to correct motion type on 6/5/2019 (REK).
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Unified Investigative & Sciences Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Hedberg, Kelly)
April 26, 2019 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #7 Preliminary Order. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP; (2) MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on July 22, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 3. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/26/19. (MAW)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (MCO)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Allstate Insurance Company. (MCO)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16816050. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2577-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Unified Investigative & Sciences Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent T&H Holdings Incorporated, Corporate Parent Toplis & Harding Holding Incorporated, Corporate Parent Sedgwick Claims Management Services Incorporated for Unified Investigative & Sciences Incorporated. (Hedberg, Kelly) (MCO)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-050962. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16816050 filed by Unified Investigative & Sciences Incorporated. (Hedberg, Kelly) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Declaration)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood et al v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Investigative & Sciences Incorporated
Represented By: Steven G Mesaros
Represented By: Kelly Ann Hedberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?