Winters v. Orion Homes LLC
Plaintiff: William Winters
Defendant: Orion Homes LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02607
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that this matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate this matter on 7/22/2019 without further leave of Court. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/19/2019. (MMO)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement by William Winters. (Knoller, Guy)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/23/2019. (MMO)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Orion Homes LLC. (Rocush, Erica)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Orion Homes LLC.(Rocush, Erica)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/26/19. (CLB)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Orion Homes LLC. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/25/2019. (MMO)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAH)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2607-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by William Winters. (Knoller, Guy) (KAH)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by William Winters. (Knoller, Guy) (KAH)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by William Winters. (Knoller, Guy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winters v. Orion Homes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Winters
Represented By: Guy David Knoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orion Homes LLC
Represented By: Erica K Rocush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?