Penksa v. Trans Union LLC et al

Plaintiff: John Penksa
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02662
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the #7 Stipulation for Extension is granted. Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s time to respond to the complaint is extended to August 9, 2019. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/1/19. (MSA)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Griego, Adrianna)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY ORDER: A motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service no later than 7/25/2019. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on 7/25/2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been servedpursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(LMR)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16835632. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2662-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 *SUMMONS Submitted by John Penksa. (Kent, Trinette) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons [incorrect attachment])(MFR) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2019: #3 Summons 3 (correct attachment)) (MFR). *Modified on 4/26/2019 (MFR).
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16835632 filed by John Penksa. (Kent, Trinette) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penksa v. Trans Union LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Penksa
Represented By: Trinette G Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Adrianna Griego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?