Usherson v. Press Pass Collectibles LLC
Plaintiff: Arthur Usherson
Defendant: Press Pass Collectibles LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02692
Filed: April 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed with prejudice within 45 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. Clerk is directed to terminate this matter on July 15, 2019 without further leave of Court. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/30/2019. (TCA)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement by Arthur Usherson. (Liebowitz, Richard)
April 29, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Richard Liebowitz on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on July 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/29/2019. (TCA)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/29/2019. (TCA)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Arthur Usherson. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type and Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1 (a)(1) - Attorney information is not listed to the left of center of the page and beginning at line (1) on the first page. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Arthur Usherson. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Press Pass Collectibles LLC. (MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
April 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Arthur Usherson. (Liebowitz, Richard) (MFR)
April 28, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (MFR)
April 28, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16840864. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2692-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
April 28, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Arthur Usherson. (Liebowitz, Richard) (MFR)
April 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16840864 filed by Arthur Usherson. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Usherson v. Press Pass Collectibles LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Press Pass Collectibles LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Usherson
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?