Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Advantage Auto Glass LLC et al
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company and GEICO General Insurance Company
Defendant: Jeremy Solheim and Advantage Auto Glass LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02705
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (SECOND REQUEST) by Advantage Auto Glass LLC, Jeremy Solheim. (Caliendo, Ralph)
May 30, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Advantage Auto Glass LLC, Jeremy Solheim. (Caliendo, Ralph)
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Thorpe, William)
May 29, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Advantage Auto Glass LLC, Jeremy Solheim. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Caliendo, Ralph)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph Anthony Caliendo on behalf of Advantage Auto Glass LLC, Jeremy Solheim. (Caliendo, Ralph)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statements, Notice to Parties, etc. upon Jeremy Solheim on 05/09/2019. (Thorpe, William)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statements, Notice to Parties, etc. upon Advantage Auto Glass, LLC on 05/09/2019. (Thorpe, William)
May 9, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Steven Henesy, Barry Levy, and Michael Vanunu on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/30/2019. (TCA)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER:Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the timerequired by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on July 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/30/2019. (TCA)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (KAH). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAH)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16843660. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2705-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Thorpe, William) (Attachments: #1 Summons) (KAH)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Company. (Thorpe, William) (KAH)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Thorpe, William) (KAH)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Thorpe, William) (KAH)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Thorpe, William)(KAH)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16843660 filed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. (Thorpe, William) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4a, #6 Exhibit 4b, #7 Exhibit 4c, #8 Exhibit 4d, #9 Exhibit 4e, #10 Exhibit 4f, #11 Exhibit 4g, #12 Exhibit 4h, #13 Exhibit 4i, #14 Exhibit 4j)(KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Advantage Auto Glass LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: Michael Vanunu
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: Michael Vanunu
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: Michael Vanunu
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: Michael Vanunu
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Solheim
Represented By: Bert Daniel Millett
Represented By: Ralph Anthony Caliendo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advantage Auto Glass LLC
Represented By: Bert Daniel Millett
Represented By: Ralph Anthony Caliendo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?