Smith v. Braden

Appellee: Barbara Louise Braden
Appellant: Jim D Smith
Case Number: 2:2019cv02707
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF READINESS. The Record on Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court is complete. The Bankruptcy Court shall retain the record. The filing of this Certificate constitutes the date of entry of the appeal on the docket in the District Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Appellant must show cause in writing on or before July 19, 2019 why this action should not be terminated for failure to comply with the requirements stated in the #1 Notice of Filing of Appeal and Notice of Referral of Appeal to the District Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED this action shall be dismissed by the Clerk of Court without further order if Appellant fails to comply. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/1/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE from the Bankruptcy Court that the certificate that the Record on Appeal is complete cannot be filed for the reason(s) stated in the attached document. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (MSA)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (MSA)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Barbara Louise Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jim D Smith
Represented By: Jimmie D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?