Carrier v. Frank
Plaintiff: Richard C Carrier
Defendant: Amy Elizabeth Frank
Case Number: 2:2019cv02719
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 37 LODGED Proposed Plaintiff's Sur-Reply in Answer to Defense Reply in Support of Defense Motion to Dismiss re: #36 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Richard C Carrier. (Carrier, Richard C)
July 3, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Richard C Carrier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit of Proposed Sur-Reply, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carrier, Richard C)
July 1, 2019 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(h)(3) filed by Amy Elizabeth Frank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Randazza, Marc)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically (Doc. #32 ). Counsel for Defendant, Marc J. Randazza and LaTeigra C. Cahill, may appear telephonically at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for July 22, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. (Arizona time). Chambers will e-mail dial-in information to Defendant's counsel prior to the conference. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/1/19. (JAMA)
June 28, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re: #32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically in Support filed by Richard C Carrier. (Carrier, Richard C)
June 28, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Amy Elizabeth Frank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Randazza, Marc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 31 Sur-REPLY re: #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Amy Elizabeth Frank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (DXD)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. The Clerk shall file Attachments 1 and 2 to Document 22 as a separate entry on the docket. Plaintiff's #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically is granted. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/28/19. (DXD)
June 27, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(h)(3) filed by Richard C Carrier. (Carrier, Richard C)
June 24, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #27 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by Amy Elizabeth Frank. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
June 24, 2019 Filing 27 *NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Amy Elizabeth Frank. (Cahill, LaTeigra) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation on 6/25/2019 (SST).
June 18, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re: #22 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Richard C Carrier. (Carrier, Richard C)
June 18, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support of #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(h)(3) by Defendant Amy Elizabeth Frank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Randazza, Marc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(h)(3) by Amy Elizabeth Frank. (Randazza, Marc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Amy Elizabeth Frank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Randazza, Marc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Richard C Carrier. (DXD)
June 17, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically filed by Richard C Carrier. (Carrier, Richard C)
June 13, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically filed by Amy Elizabeth Frank. (Randazza, Marc)
June 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Richard C Carrier. (Carrier, Richard C)
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Richard C Carrier. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order to Appear Telephonically)(Carrier, Richard C)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. The parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than seven (7) days before the Scheduling Conference. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/11/19. (JAMA)
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #15 Answer to Counterclaim. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1) - Please note for future filings; information that must be stated upon the first page of every document and may be presented for filing. Filer information must be typed in upper left corner. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
June 7, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for LaTeigra C Cahill on behalf of Amy Elizabeth Frank. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 7, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Richard C Carrier.(Carrier, Richard C)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing. The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within 5 days of the date of this Order. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/31/19. (DXD)
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Richard C Carrier, Richard C Carrier. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (MSA)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Richard C Carrier. (MSA)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #9 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA filed by Amy Elizabeth Frank, #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Amy Elizabeth Frank. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Richard C Carrier by Amy Elizabeth Frank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Randazza, Marc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Marc J. Randazza appearing for Amy Elizabeth Frank. . (Randazza, Marc)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on July 29, 2019. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/13/19. (JAMA)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/13/19. (JAMA)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (DXD)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Amy Elizabeth Frank. (DXD)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DXD)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX207835. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-02719-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DXD)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Richard C Carrier. (DXD)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number PHX207835 filed by Richard C Carrier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrier v. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Elizabeth Frank
Represented By: LaTeigra C Cahill
Represented By: Marc John Randazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard C Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?