Curry v. Experian Information Solutions Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Rodney Curry
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Incorporated, Hyundai Capital America Incorporated and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02726
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to Answer Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dessaules, Jonathan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. (Dessaules, Jonathan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Adam Dessaules on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. (Dessaules, Jonathan)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/1/2019. (TCA)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on July 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/1/2019. (TCA)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Incorporated, Hyundai Capital America Incorporated, Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16847327. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2726-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Rodney Curry. (Kent, Trinette) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MCO)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16847327 filed by Rodney Curry. (Kent, Trinette) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curry v. Experian Information Solutions Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Incorporated
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Dessaules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Capital America Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Curry
Represented By: Trinette G Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?