Medley v. Schaffer Ellis & Associates

Plaintiff: Laura L Medley
Defendant: Schaffer Ellis & Associates
Case Number: 2:2019cv02751
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle
Referring Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs #2 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint #1 , with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint no later than July 5, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff does not file an Amended Complaint by July 5, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action without further Order of this Court. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/20/2019. (REK)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge John J Tuchi. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-2751-PHX-JJT. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for July 1, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order that Laura L Medley show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/1/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAS)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-02751-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Instructions)(BAS)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Laura L Medley. (BAS)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Laura L Medley.(BAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medley v. Schaffer Ellis & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schaffer Ellis & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura L Medley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?