Bhattacharya v. HISCOX Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Sourav Sam Bhattacharya
Defendant: Unknown Parties, HISCOX Insurance Company and HISCOX Insurance Company Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv02780
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 JOINT PROPOSED RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 6/25/2020. Dispositive motions due by 7/27/2020. The Case Management Conference set for Friday, June 28, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 6/25/2019. (REK)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline. The Joint Rule 26(f) Case Management Report and Joint Proposed Rule 16 Case Management Order shall be filed no later than June 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 6/25/19. (EJA)
June 21, 2019 Filing 23 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Defendant HISCOX Insurance Company Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernardone, Daniel)
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Rule 26(f) Case Management Report and Joint Proposed Rule 16 Case Management Order by HISCOX Insurance Company Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bernardone, Daniel)
June 14, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) Joint Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery Requests filed by Defendant HISCOX Insurance Company. (Bernardone, Daniel)
June 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Disclosure by Sourav Sam Bhattacharya. (EJA)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #11 Plaintiff's Motion for Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 6/11/19. (EJA)
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sourav Sam Bhattacharya. (DXD)
May 23, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re: #11 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant HISCOX Insurance Company Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E)(Sluga, Gena) *Modified to correct event on 5/30/2019 (DXD).
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE for 6/28/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 5/14/19. (EJA)
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 10, 2019 Filing 14 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Sourav Sam Bhattacharya. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (EJA)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court, RESPONSE to #1 Notice of Removal by Plaintiff Sourav Sam Bhattacharya. (EJA) *Modified to add motion on 5/30/2019 (DXD).
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by HISCOX Insurance Company Incorporated.(Sluga, Gena)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (MCO)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16859349. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2780-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (MCO)
May 1, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Notice of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint upon HISCOX Insurance Company Incorporated on 4/3/2019. (MCO) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HISCOX Insurance Company Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Hiscox Limited for HISCOX Insurance Company Incorporated. (Sluga, Gena) (MCO)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-052190. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16859349 filed by HISCOX Insurance Company Incorporated, HISCOX Insurance Company. (Sluga, Gena) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bhattacharya v. HISCOX Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sourav Sam Bhattacharya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HISCOX Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Bernardone
Represented By: Gena LoPresto Sluga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HISCOX Insurance Company Incorporated
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Bernardone
Represented By: Gena LoPresto Sluga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?