Mallon v. Liftable Media Incorporated

Plaintiff: Stephen Mallon
Defendant: Liftable Media Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv02782
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liftable Media Incorporated. (Barker, David)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 Liftable Media Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand Liftable Media Inc.'s Answer to Complaint by Liftable Media Incorporated.(Barker, David)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until July 1, 2019 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/4/19. (MAW)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Liftable Media Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barker, David)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED: Declaration of Service re: summons, civil cover sheet, exhibits, jury demand upon Liftable Media, Inc. (via Krisheena Johnson) on 5/13/19. (SLQ)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #5 Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Stephen Mallon. The submitted form is incomplete. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile a corrected document that includes the copyright registration numbers or applicable information. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Liftable Media Incorporated. (KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Stephen Mallon. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1) Title Page does not include filing attorney information in upper left corner. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Stephen Mallon. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Stephen Mallon. (Liebowitz, Richard) (KEP)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (KEP)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16859917. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2782-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Stephen Mallon. (Liebowitz, Richard) (KEP)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16859917 filed by Stephen Mallon. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mallon v. Liftable Media Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liftable Media Incorporated
Represented By: Adam Elliott Lang
Represented By: David Gary Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Mallon
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?