Broadcast Music Incorporated et al v. Elsberry Investments LLC et al

Plaintiff: Reservoir Media Management Incorporated, Zombies Ate My Publishing, Terry Stafford Music Company, Unichappell Music Incorporated, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Cotillion Music Incorporated, Forthefallen Publishing, Del Sound Music, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Reservoir One America and Interior Music Corporation
Defendant: Shane Elsberry, Bryon Elsberry and Elsberry Investments LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02821
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Broadcast Music Incorporated, Cotillion Music Incorporated, Del Sound Music, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Forthefallen Publishing, Interior Music Corporation, Reservoir Media Management Incorporated, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Terry Stafford Music Company, Unichappell Music Incorporated, Zombies Ate My Publishing: Certificates of Service re: Summons, and Complaint. Elsberry Investments LLC served on 5/10/2019, Shane Elsberry served on 5/13/2019, Bryon Elsberry served on 5/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certificate of Service)(Deatherage, Mark) *Modified to list documents served and dates of service on 5/21/2019 (REK).
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on August 2, 2019. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/10/19. (JAMA)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/10/19. (JAMA)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(BAC)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bryon Elsberry, Shane Elsberry, Elsberry Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16868828. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-02821-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Broadcast Music Incorporated, Cotillion Music Incorporated, Del Sound Music, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Forthefallen Publishing, Interior Music Corporation, Reservoir Media Management Incorporated, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Terry Stafford Music Company, Unichappell Music Incorporated, Zombies Ate My Publishing. (Deatherage, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music Incorporated, Cotillion Music Incorporated, Del Sound Music, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Forthefallen Publishing, Interior Music Corporation, Reservoir Media Management Incorporated, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Terry Stafford Music Company, Unichappell Music Incorporated, Zombies Ate My Publishing. (BAC)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-16868828 filed by Reservoir Media Management Incorporated, Interior Music Corporation, Cotillion Music Incorporated, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Unichappell Music Incorporated, Terry Stafford Music Company, Zombies Ate My Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Del Sound Music, Forthefallen Publishing. (Deatherage, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music Incorporated et al v. Elsberry Investments LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reservoir Media Management Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zombies Ate My Publishing
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Stafford Music Company
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unichappell Music Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cotillion Music Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forthefallen Publishing
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Del Sound Music
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reservoir One America
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interior Music Corporation
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Elsberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryon Elsberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsberry Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?