Johnson v. Mesa, City of et al
Plaintiff: Robert Johnson
Defendant: Rudy Monarrez, Mesa, City of, Jhonte Jones and Ernesto Calderon
Case Number: 2:2019cv02827
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle (PS)
Referring Judge: John Z Boyle
2 Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 232 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns: Settlement Conference held on 11/17/2021. Present were: Joel B. Robbins, Jesse Morgan Showalter, Benjamin Paul Taylor, II with and for Plaintiff; Daniel J. O'Connor and Daniel Joseph O'Connor, III, for Defendant Calderon; Christina Gail Retts and Kathleen L. Wieneke for Defendant Jones; Kim Seibert Alvarado for Defendants City of Mesa and Monarrez. A court reporter was not present nor the Settlement Conference recorded. A settlement was not reached. Hearing held 9:30 AM to 2:45 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MHB, ec)
November 5, 2021 Filing 231 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Laura Anne Van Buren. (Van Buren, Laura)
November 1, 2021 Filing 230 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #225 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal filed by Ernesto Calderon, Jhonte Jones, Rudy Monarrez. (Retts, Christina)
October 26, 2021 Filing 229 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #225 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal filed by Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
October 26, 2021 Filing 228 *WITHDRAWAL of Document #227 Response in Opposition to Motion . (Showalter, Jesse) *Modified to correct event on 10/27/2021 (WLP).
October 26, 2021 Filing 227 *WITHDRAWN pursuant to #228 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #225 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal and CROSS MOTION to Declare Appeal Frivolous and Retain Jurisdiction filed by Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse) *Modified to correct event on 10/27/2021. Attorney notified. (SMH)
October 18, 2021 Filing 226 NOTICE re: Trial Dates by Robert Johnson . (Showalter, Jesse)
October 12, 2021 Filing 225 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal by Jhonte Jones. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Retts, Christina)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting the Joint Motion (Doc. #220 ), IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Officer-Defendants Monarrez, Jones, and Calderon are excused from personally attending the settlement conference scheduled on November 17, 2021. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 10/8/21. (SMH)
October 7, 2021 Filing 223 USCA Case Number re: #217 Notice of Appeal. Case number 21-16648, Ninth Circuit. (KAH)
October 7, 2021 Filing 222 USCA Case Number re: #219 Notice of Appeal. Case number 21-16647, Ninth Circuit. (KAH)
October 7, 2021 Filing 221 USCA Case Number re: #218 Notice of Appeal. Case number 21-16646, Ninth Circuit. (KAH)
October 7, 2021 Filing 220 MOTION Defendants Monarrez, Jones and Calderon's Unopposed Joint Motion to Excuse Presence of Individual Officer-Defendants at Settlement Conference by Mesa, City of, Rudy Monarrez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alvarado, Kim)
October 6, 2021 Filing 219 *Notice of Interlocutory Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #214 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Rudy Monarrez. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-19941897. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Alvarado, Kim) *Modified to correct event type on 10/7/2021. (SMH)
October 6, 2021 Filing 218 *Notice of Interlocutory Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #214 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Jhonte Jones. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-19941822. (Retts, Christina) *Modified to correct event type on 10/7/2021. (SMH)
October 6, 2021 Filing 217 *Notice of Interlocutory Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #214 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Ernesto Calderon. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-19941759. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(O'Connor, Daniel)*Modified to correct event type on 10/7/2021. (SMH)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED withdrawing the reference to Magistrate Judge Boyle as to this entire case. (This withdrawal has no impact on the reference to Magistrate Judge Burns for purposes of conducting the settlement conference.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel must confer among themselves and with their respective witnesses and by October 18, 2021, file a notice that includes an estimated length of trial and proposes at least two dates on which the parties would be available to begin trial that will allow trial to conclude by April 8, 2022. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/4/21. (SMH)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER: This case has been referred to United States Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns for a Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 11/17/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. See document for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 9/28/2021. (REK)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER - (1) The reference to Magistrate Judge Boyle is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment (Doc. #174 , #176 , #181 , #182 ) and Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. #177 ). (2) Defendant Calderon's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #174 ) is denied. (3) Defendant Jones' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #176 ) is denied. (4) Defendant Monarrez's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #181 ) is denied. (5) Defendant City of Mesas Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 182) is granted in part and denied in part as follows: (a) the Motion is granted as to Plaintiff's negligent supervision claim, and the Motion is denied as to all other claims against the City. (6) Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. #177 ) is denied. (7) The remaining claims are: Plaintiff's Fourth Amendment excessive force against Defendants Jones, Calderon, and Monarrez, Plaintiffs and state law assault and battery claim against Defendants Jones, Calderon, Monarrez and the City, Plaintiff's Monell claim against the City, and Plaintiff's state law negligent training claim against the City. (8) This action is referred to Magistrate Judge Burns to conduct a settlement conference on Plaintiff's remaining claims. (9) Counsel shall arrange for the relevant parties to jointly call Magistrate Judge Burns' chambers (602) 322-7610 within fourteen (14) days to schedule a date for the settlement conference. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/8/2021. (LAD)
August 13, 2021 Filing 213 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
July 21, 2021 Filing 212 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
June 14, 2021 Filing 211 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Daniel Joseph O'Connor, III. (O'Connor, Daniel)
June 3, 2021 Filing 210 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
May 24, 2021 Filing 209 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Jhonte Jones. (Retts, Christina)
April 22, 2021 Filing 208 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #182 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant City of Mesa's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Mesa, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Alvarado, Kim)
April 22, 2021 Filing 207 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #181 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Officer Monarrez's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Rudy Monarrez. (Alvarado, Kim)
April 22, 2021 Filing 206 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #174 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ernesto Calderon. (Stillwell, Karen)
April 22, 2021 Filing 205 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #176 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jhonte Jones. (18 pages) (MHW)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Defendant's Motion (doc. #203 ) is granted. The Clerk is directed to file Defendant's proposed Reply (lodged at doc. 202). Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 04/22/2021. (MHW)
April 22, 2021 Filing 203 *MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendant's #202 Lodged Proposed Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Jhonte Jones. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Retts, Christina) Modified to add link, reply was accidentally filed instead of lodged on 4/22/2021 (WLP).
April 22, 2021 Filing 202 *Filed at #205 pursuant to #204 Order -- LODGED Proposed REPLY to Response to Motion re: #176 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jhonte Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Retts, Christina) *Modified to change to lodged, attorney called and said they filed accidentally on 4/22/2021 (WLP). *Modified on 4/22/2021 (MHW).
April 16, 2021 Filing 201 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #177 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
April 14, 2021 Filing 200 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
April 14, 2021 Filing 199 NOTICE of Errata re: #172 Statement of Facts by Defendant Jhonte Jones.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19)(Retts, Christina)
April 9, 2021 Filing 198 NOTICE re: Filing Non-Electronic Exhibit by Robert Johnson . (Showalter, Jesse)
April 8, 2021 Filing 197 SEALED Exhibits 6, 7, and 9 re: #192 Statement of Facts by Robert Johnson. (SLQ)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Non-Electronic Exhibit (doc. #193 ) is granted. Plaintiff may file "one flash-drive containing video data designated as Plaintiff's Exhibit 10 (Off the Cuff) in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Global Statement of Facts and Plaintiff's Controverting Statement of Facts." (Id. at 1.) 2. Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Exhibits to Plaintiff's Response and to Defendants' Global Statement of Facts and Plaintiff's Controverting Statement of Facts (doc. #194 ) is granted. The Clerk is directed to file the document containing proposed Exhibits 6, 7, and 9 (lodged at doc. #195 ), under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 4/8/21. (SLQ)
April 1, 2021 Filing 195 *FILED at #197 * SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibits 6, 7, & 9 re: #194 MOTION to Seal Document . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse) Modified on 4/8/2021 (SLQ).
April 1, 2021 Filing 194 MOTION to Seal Document by Robert Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Showalter, Jesse)
April 1, 2021 Filing 193 MOTION Leave to File Non-Electronic Exhibits re: #192 Statement of Facts by Robert Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Showalter, Jesse)
April 1, 2021 Filing 192 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #190 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, #191 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, #188 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, #189 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-19)(Showalter, Jesse)
April 1, 2021 Filing 191 RESPONSE to Motion re: #174 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
April 1, 2021 Filing 190 RESPONSE to Motion re: #181 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Officer Monarrez's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
April 1, 2021 Filing 189 RESPONSE to Motion re: #182 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant City of Mesa's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
April 1, 2021 Filing 188 RESPONSE to Motion re: #176 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
April 1, 2021 Filing 187 RESPONSE to Motion re: #177 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Ernesto Calderon, Jhonte Jones, Rudy Monarrez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(Retts, Christina)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting #185 Stipulated Motion. The deadlines to pending Motions for Summary Judgment (docs. #174 , #176 , #177 , #181 , #182 ) are as follows: Responses shall be filed on or before April 1, 2021; Replies shall be filed on or before April 22, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 2/22/2021. (LAD)
February 9, 2021 Flash Drive - As outlined in Defendant Jones' Notice of Filing Non-Electronic Exhibits (Doc. #184 ) has been received and will be stored in the Phoenix file room. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
February 9, 2021 Filing 185 STIPULATION Stipulated Motion on Briefing Schedule for Dispositive Motions by Mesa, City of, Rudy Monarrez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alvarado, Kim)
February 9, 2021 Filing 184 NOTICE re: Filing Non-Electronic Exhibits by Jhonte Jones re: #172 Statement of Facts, #175 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief . (Retts, Christina)
February 5, 2021 Filing 183 NOTICE re: of Filing Non-Electronic Exhibits by Robert Johnson . (Showalter, Jesse)
February 5, 2021 Flash Drive - As outlined in the Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Non-Electronic Exhibits (Doc. #183 ) has been received and will be stored in the Phoenix file room. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
February 4, 2021 Filing 182 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant City of Mesa's Motion for Summary Judgment by Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
February 4, 2021 Filing 181 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Officer Monarrez's Motion for Summary Judgment by Rudy Monarrez. (Alvarado, Kim)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER - 1. Defendant Johnson's Motion (doc. #179 ) is granted. 2. On or before February 10, 2021, Defendant Johnson may submit his non-electronic exhibits in support of his Statement of Facts on a flash drive to the Clerk for filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 2/4/2021. (LAD)
February 4, 2021 Filing 179 MOTION for Leave to File Non-Electronic Exhibits re: #178 Statement of Facts by Robert Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Showalter, Jesse)
February 4, 2021 Filing 178 * STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #177 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Showalter, Jesse) * Modified to add text on 2/5/2021 (LAD).
February 4, 2021 Filing 177 * MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 2/5/2021 (LAD).
February 4, 2021 Filing 176 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jhonte Jones. (REK)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 *ORDER: Defendant Jones's Motion #170 is granted. The Clerk is directed to file Defendant Jones's proposed Motion for Summary Judgment (lodged at doc. #171 ). Defendant Jones's Motion #173 is granted. On or before February 10, 2021, Defendant Jones may submit his non-electronic exhibits in support of his Statement of Facts on a flash drive to the Clerk for filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 2/04/2021. (REK) *Modified to correct text to reflect Order signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 2/5/2021 (REK).
February 4, 2021 Filing 174 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ernesto Calderon. (Stillwell, Karen)
February 4, 2021 Filing 173 MOTION For Leave To File Non-Electronic Exhibits re: #172 Statement of Facts by Jhonte Jones. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Retts, Christina)
February 4, 2021 Filing 172 *STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #176 Motion for Summary Judgment and re: #171 Lodged Proposed Document by Defendant Jhonte Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1-19, #3 Exhibit 20 - Jones Training, #4 Exhibit 21 - Monarrez Training, #5 Exhibit 22 - Walker Deposition, #6 Exhibit 23-27, #7 Exhibit 28-33)(Retts, Christina) *Modified to add additional document link on 2/4/2021 (REK).
February 4, 2021 Filing 171 *Filed at #176 per Order #175 *LODGED Proposed Defendant Jones' Motion for Summary Judgment re: #170 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Jhonte Jones. (Retts, Christina) Modified on 2/4/2021 (REK).
February 4, 2021 Filing 170 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Jhonte Jones. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Retts, Christina)
December 28, 2020 Filing 169 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
December 17, 2020 Filing 168 REPORT of Settlement Talks/Discussions by Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
December 17, 2020 Filing 167 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
December 14, 2020 Filing 166 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
December 9, 2020 Filing 165 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
December 4, 2020 Filing 164 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ernesto Calderon. (Stillwell, Karen)
December 4, 2020 Filing 163 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Jhonte Jones. (Retts, Christina)
December 3, 2020 Filing 162 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Rudy Monarrez. (Alvarado, Kim)
December 3, 2020 Filing 161 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
November 25, 2020 Filing 160 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
November 25, 2020 Filing 159 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Ernesto Calderon. (Stillwell, Karen)
November 25, 2020 Filing 158 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
November 25, 2020 Filing 157 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Rudy Monarrez. (Alvarado, Kim)
November 25, 2020 Filing 156 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
November 19, 2020 Filing 155 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
November 18, 2020 Filing 154 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
November 12, 2020 Filing 153 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
November 12, 2020 Filing 152 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Jhonte Jones. (Retts, Christina)
November 12, 2020 Filing 151 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
November 4, 2020 Filing 150 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
October 28, 2020 Filing 149 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
October 28, 2020 Filing 148 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) & Supplemental Discovery Responses filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
October 23, 2020 Filing 147 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
October 7, 2020 Filing 146 NOTICE re: Intent to Serve Subpoena by Mesa, City of . (Alvarado, Kim)
September 30, 2020 Filing 145 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Ernesto Calderon. (Stillwell, Karen)
September 15, 2020 Filing 144 NOTICE re: Intent to Serve Subpoenas by Robert Johnson . (Robbins, Joel)
September 9, 2020 Filing 143 NOTICE of Deposition of Kenneth Wallentine, filed by Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
September 9, 2020 Filing 142 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
September 3, 2020 Filing 141 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #139 Stipulation. The Custodian of Records of the Arizona Board of Pharmacy shall produce a complete, authenticated copy of Robert Lee Johnson Jr.'s Patient Report from January 1, 2013 through the date of this order, as available on the Arizona State Board of Pharmacy Controlled Substances Prescription Monitoring Program on or before September 4, 2020, to:Daniel J. OConnor, Jr. Karen J. Stillwell. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 8/18/2020. (LAD)
August 10, 2020 Filing 139 STIPULATION for Order to Arizona Board of Pharmacy Regarding Controlled Substances Prescription Monitoring Program Database Information by Ernesto Calderon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stillwell, Karen)
August 7, 2020 Filing 138 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Ernesto Calderon. (Stillwell, Karen)
August 7, 2020 Filing 137 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Jhonte Jones. (Retts, Christina)
August 7, 2020 Filing 136 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
August 6, 2020 Filing 135 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Rudy Monarrez. (Alvarado, Kim)
August 6, 2020 Filing 134 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
August 6, 2020 Filing 133 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
July 24, 2020 Filing 132 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER - IT IS ORDER that the parties' Amended Stipulation for Independent Psychological Examination (doc. #130 ) is granted. The examination shall take place on July 29, 2020 at 10:00 a.m., by John T. Beck, Jr., PhD ABPP-CO, at the offices of PsychCheck LLC, at 7272 E. Indian School Road, Suite 540, Scottsdale, Arizona. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 7/22/2020. (LAD)
July 14, 2020 Filing 130 STIPULATION Amended Stipulation for Independent Psychological Examination by Mesa, City of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alvarado, Kim)
June 30, 2020 Filing 129 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED:The parties' Stipulation (doc. [127)] is granted. Discovery due by 11/25/2020. Dispositive motions due by 2/4/2021. All other deadlines and directives set forth in the Courts prior orders are affirmed. Further extensions of these deadlines will not be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. (See document for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 6/2/20. (SLQ)
May 21, 2020 Filing 127 STIPULATION re: #118 Order on Stipulation, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order by Mesa, City of, Rudy Monarrez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alvarado, Kim)
April 29, 2020 Filing 126 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
April 29, 2020 Filing 125 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
April 27, 2020 Filing 124 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Jhonte Jones. (Retts, Christina)
April 23, 2020 Filing 123 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
April 21, 2020 Filing 122 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
April 16, 2020 Filing 121 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
April 13, 2020 Filing 120 *NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Duces Tecum filed by Jhonte Jones. (Retts, Christina) *Modified text on 4/13/2020 (SLQ).
April 10, 2020 Filing 119 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER - The parties' Stipulation (doc. #116 ) is granted. Discovery due by 9/24/2020. Dispositive motions due by 12/3/2020. (See document for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 4/8/20. (SLQ)
April 7, 2020 Filing 117 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) Second filed by Defendant Ernesto Calderon. (Stillwell, Karen)
April 7, 2020 Filing 116 *STIPULATION To Amend Scheduling Order (5th Request) by Mesa, City of and Rudy Monarrez (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alvarado, Kim) *Modified filers on 4/7/2020 (SLQ).
April 1, 2020 Filing 115 NOTICE re: Intent to Serve Subpoena by Mesa, City of . (Alvarado, Kim)
March 30, 2020 Filing 114 NOTICE re: Intent to Serve Subpoena by Ernesto Calderon . (Stillwell, Karen)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #111 Stipulation. The following deadlines are extended as detailed: Defendants' expert disclosures: May 7, 2020, Rebuttal expert disclosures: June 4, 2020, MIDP responses and Fact discovery: August 28, 2020, Expert depositions: August 28, 2020, Good-faith settlement talks: September 25, 2020, Dispositive motions: October 30, 2020. See document for detail. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 3/30/20. (EJA)
March 25, 2020 Filing 112 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Jhonte Jones. (Retts, Christina)
March 25, 2020 Filing 111 *STIPULATION to Amend Scheduling Order by Mesa, City of, Rudy Monarrez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alvarado, Kim) *Modified to add filer on 3/26/2020 (DXD).
March 24, 2020 Filing 110 NOTICE re: Intent to Serve Subpoena by Mesa, City of . (Alvarado, Kim)
March 23, 2020 Filing 109 NOTICE re: Intent to Serve Subpoenas Duces Tecum by Jhonte Jones . (Retts, Christina)
March 19, 2020 Filing 108 NOTICE re: Intent to Serve Subpoena by Mesa, City of . (Alvarado, Kim)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: The #106 "Stipulation for Independent Psychological Examination" is granted. Defendants will provide to Plaintiff a copy of the report prepared by Dr. Beck no later than April 9, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 3/19/20. (GMP)
March 17, 2020 Filing 106 STIPULATION for Independent Psychological Exam by Mesa, City of, Rudy Monarrez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Alvarado, Kim)
March 11, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
March 4, 2020 Filing 104 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
March 2, 2020 Filing 103 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #101 Stipulation to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines. See document for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 2/27/20. (EJA)
February 27, 2020 Filing 101 STIPULATION to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines by Robert Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robbins, Joel)
February 18, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
February 11, 2020 Filing 99 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
February 7, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Jhonte Jones. (Retts, Christina)
February 4, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
February 4, 2020 Filing 96 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
February 3, 2020 Filing 95 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Ernesto Calderon. (Stillwell, Karen)
January 29, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
January 22, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER: The Stipulation #91 is granted. Plaintiff Robert Johnson shall appear for an IME on March 6, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. to be conducted by William Stevens, M.D., the Center for Spinal Disorders, 3133 East Camelback Road, Suite 245, Phoenix, Arizona. Plaintiff shall be responsible for the doctor's customary cancellation fee of $2,500 should he be late to or fail to appear for the scheduled examination, or should he fail to provide notice to Defendants that he will not appear for the examination pursuant to Dr. Stevens' cancellation policy. Defendants will provide to Plaintiff a copy of the report prepared by Dr. Stevens no later than the April 3, 2020 deadline reflected in the Court's January 3, 2020 Order at Doc. #87 . See document for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 1/21/2020. (REK)
January 16, 2020 Filing 91 STIPULATION for Independent Medical Examination by Ernesto Calderon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stillwell, Karen)
January 13, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
January 13, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
January 6, 2020 Filing 88 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER: The Motion (Doc. #82 ) is granted. The Court sets forth the following new discovery deadlines: Plaintiff's expert disclosure: February 28, 2020. Defendant's expert disclosure: April 3, 2020. Rebuttal expert disclosure: May 1, 2020. MIDP Responses and Fact discovery: July 31, 2020. Expert depositions: July 31, 2020. Dispositive motions: October 2, 2020. Good faith settlement talks: August 28, 2020. All other deadlines and orders set forth in the Court's August 8, 2019 Scheduling Order are affirmed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 01/03/2020. (SST)
December 31, 2019 Filing 86 Third AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of 30(b)(6) as to topics 6, 7, 8, 10 & 11, filed by Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
December 31, 2019 Filing 85 Second AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of 30(b)(6) as to topics 1 & 4, filed by Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
December 30, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
December 30, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
December 24, 2019 Filing 82 *Stipulated MOTION to Extend Discovery Deadlines by Robert Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robbins, Joel) *Modified to correct event on 12/26/2019 (REK).
December 23, 2019 Filing 81 First AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Rudy Monarrez, filed by Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
December 23, 2019 Filing 80 First AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Ernesto Calderon, filed by Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
December 18, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
December 16, 2019 Filing 78 First AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of 30(b)(6) (topics 2, 3, 5 & 12), filed by Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE re: Intent to Serve Subpoena by Robert Johnson . (Showalter, Jesse)
December 9, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Rudy Monarrez. (Alvarado, Kim)
December 9, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
December 9, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
December 9, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ernesto Calderon. (Stillwell, Karen)
December 9, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Jhonte Jones. (Retts, Christina)
December 4, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Jhonte Jones. (Retts, Christina)
December 4, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Rudy Monarrez. (Alvarado, Kim)
December 4, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
December 4, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ernesto Calderon. (Stillwell, Karen)
December 2, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE re: Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff by Ernesto Calderon . (Stillwell, Karen)
December 2, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
November 25, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE re: Intent to Serve Subpoena by Mesa, City of . (Alvarado, Kim)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: The Stipulation #61 is granted. MIDP Responses and Fact discovery due June 19, 2020. Dispositive motions due August 21, 2020. All other deadlines and orders set forth in the Court's August 8, 2019 Scheduling Order #31 are affirmed. See document for further details and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 11/25/2019. (REK)
November 25, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Channell, Lauren)
November 19, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
November 14, 2019 Filing 61 STIPULATION re: #52 Order on Stipulation, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Stipulated Motion to Correct Scheduling Order by Mesa, City of, Rudy Monarrez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alvarado, Kim)
November 14, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Deposition of Robert Johnson, filed by Jhonte Jones. (Retts, Christina)
November 14, 2019 Filing 59 AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Jhonte Jones, filed by Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
November 13, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Deposition of Ernesto Calderon, filed by Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
November 13, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Deposition of Jhonte Jones, filed by Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
November 12, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Deposition of Rudy Monarrez, filed by Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
November 12, 2019 Filing 55 *NOTICE of Service of Offer of Judgment by Mesa, City of, Rudy Monarrez . (Alvarado, Kim) *Modified text on 11/13/2019 (SLQ).
November 11, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Deposition of Ramon Batista, filed by Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
November 11, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Deposition of 30(b)(6), filed by Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: The Stipulation #48 is granted. Plaintiff's expert disclosure due by January 17, 2020; Defendant's expert disclosure due by February 21, 2020; Rebuttal expert disclosure due by March 20, 2020; MIDP Responses and Fact discovery due by June 19, 2020; Expert Depositions due by June 19, 2020; Dispositive motions due by June 17, 2020; Good faith settlement talks due by July 17, 2020. All other deadlines and orders set forth in the Court's August 8, 2019 Scheduling Order #31 are affirmed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 11/07/2019. (REK)
November 4, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Robert Johnson. (Showalter, Jesse)
October 28, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE re: Intent to Serve Subpoenas to Produce Documents by Mesa, City of . (Alvarado, Kim)
October 28, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
October 24, 2019 Filing 48 STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Deadlines by Robert Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robbins, Joel)
October 22, 2019 Filing 47 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Jhonte Jones.(Retts, Christina)
October 22, 2019 Filing 46 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Ernesto Calderon.(Stillwell, Karen)
October 22, 2019 Filing 45 Defendant Rudy Monarrez's ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Rudy Monarrez.(Alvarado, Kim)
October 22, 2019 Filing 44 Defendant City of Mesa's ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Mesa, City of.(Alvarado, Kim)
October 17, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Mesa, City of. (Alvarado, Kim)
October 11, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
October 8, 2019 Filing 41 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Robert Johnson.(Robbins, Joel)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint #39 is granted. Plaintiff shall file a clean copy of the proposed First Amended Complaint attached to his Motion (doc. #39 -1) in compliance with LRCiv 15.1. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 10/07/2019. (REK)
October 7, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Robert Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Robbins, Joel)
October 3, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
September 20, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
September 18, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Daniel J O'Connor. (O'Connor, Daniel)
September 16, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) and Response to First Set of RFPs and Rogs filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
September 11, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendants Mesa, City of, Rudy Monarrez. (Alvarado, Kim)
August 13, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
August 12, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mesa, City of, Rudy Monarrez. (Alvarado, Kim)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CASE MANAGMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 4/17/2020. Dispositive motions due by 6/19/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the August 12, 2019 Case Management Conference is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 8/08/2019. (REK)
August 5, 2019 Filing 30 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Case Management Order)(Showalter, Jesse)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: The Motion #20 is granted. The Court's Scheduling Order #13 is vacated. Case Management Conference set for August 12, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 302, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003. See document for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 7/16/2019. (REK)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER (text only): IT IS ORDERED that the request to reassign this case to the complex track (part of Doc. #20 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the portion of Doc. #20 that requests that the Court hold a case management conference is referred to Magistrate Magistrate Judge John Z. Boyle. Ordered by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 7/16/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
July 16, 2019 Filing 27 *NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Rudy Monarrez. (Alvarado, Kim) *Modified to correct filer on 7/17/2019 (REK).
July 11, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel)
July 9, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Kim Seibert Alvarado. (Alvarado, Kim)
July 8, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Jhonte Jones. (Retts, Christina)
July 8, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Ernesto Calderon. (Stillwell, Karen)
July 1, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants Mesa, City of, Rudy Monarrez. (Stoutner, Duncan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Request for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Reassignment of Track by Defendants Mesa, City of, Rudy Monarrez. (Stoutner, Duncan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 *MOTION/REQUEST for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, MOTION for Reassignment of Track by Plaintiff Robert Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Showalter, Jesse) *Modified to correct event and add second motion part on 6/18/2019 (REK).
June 13, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Mesa, City of Notice of Filing of Amended Answer of Defendant City of Mesa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stoutner, Duncan)
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 Defendant City of Mesa's Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Mesa, City of.(Stoutner, Duncan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant Rudy Monarrez's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Rudy Monarrez.(Stoutner, Duncan)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ernesto Calderon.(O'Connor, Daniel)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Jhonte Jones. (Retts, Christina)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jhonte Jones.(Retts, Christina)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (TO REFLECT COUNSEL): Discovery due by 10/28/2019. Dispositive motions due by 1/27/2020. See document for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 6/04/2019. (REK)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 *Amended by #13 *SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/28/2019. Dispositive motions due by 1/27/2020. See document for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 6/04/2019. (REK) Modified on 6/4/2019 (REK).
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant City of Mesa's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Mesa, City of.(Stoutner, Duncan)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Robert Johnson: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Assignment, Notice to Parties Re MIDP upon Jhonte Jones on May 16, 2019. (Robbins, Joel)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Robert Johnson: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Assignment, Notice to Parties Re MIDP upon Rudy Monarrez on May 20, 2019. (Robbins, Joel)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Robert Johnson: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Assignment, Notice to Parties Re MIDP upon Ernesto Calderon on May 16, 2019. (Robbins, Joel)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Robert Johnson: Certificate of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon City of Mesa on May 9, 2019. (Robbins, Joel)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - This matter is assigned to the standard track pursuant to Rule 16.2(b)(3) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure and the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) pursuant to General Order 17-08 (D. Ariz. Oct. 13, 2017). This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge John Z. Boyle pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/10/2019. (RMV)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (KEP)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(KEP)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16868536 filed by Robert Johnson. (Robbins, Joel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Mesa, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Johnson
Represented By: Jesse Morgan Showalter
Represented By: Lauren E Channell
Represented By: Benjamin Paul Taylor, II
Represented By: Joel B Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudy Monarrez
Represented By: Duncan Jeffrey Stoutner
Represented By: Kim Seibert Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa, City of
Represented By: Duncan Jeffrey Stoutner
Represented By: Kim Seibert Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jhonte Jones
Represented By: Kathleen L Wieneke
Represented By: Christina Gail Retts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernesto Calderon
Represented By: Daniel J O'Connor
Represented By: Karen Johnson Stillwell
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Connor, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?