Tallis et al v. Pfizer Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Meredith Tallis and Roger West
Defendant: Warner Lambert Company LLC, Parke, Davis & Company, Pfizer Incorporated, McKesson Speciality Arizona Incorporated, Pharmacia Corporation and Warner Lambert Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02853
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Jeffrey H Horowitz and Sharon Mayo on behalf of defendants. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER pursuant to #18 Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2019 is vacated and reset for 7/30/2019 at 04:30 PM. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/14/2019. (MMO)
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Parke, Davis & Company, Pfizer Incorporated, Pharmacia Corporation, Warner Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, John)
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants Parke, Davis & Company, Pfizer Incorporated, Pharmacia Corporation, Warner Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company LLC. (Hendricks, John)
June 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiffs Meredith Tallis, Roger West. (Mosier, Robert)
June 6, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Connor G Sheehan on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 *ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Parke, Davis & Company, Pfizer Incorporated, Pharmacia Corporation, Warner Lambert Company LLC, Warner Lambert Company.(Hendricks, John) *Modified on 5/14/2019 to add filer (MSA).
May 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #12 Notice (Other) filed by Roger West, Meredith Tallis. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Party Only filed by Roger West, Meredith Tallis. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Orders/Notices RE: (1) Order re 12b(6) Motions; (2) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference; and (3) Notice - Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project by Meredith Tallis, Roger West . (Mosier, Robert)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/6/2019. (MMO)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/6/2019. (MMO)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Meredith Tallis, Roger West. Party McKesson Speciality Arizona Incorporated terminated. (Mosier, Robert)
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Reagan Tully in Support of Pfizer's Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant McKesson Speciality Arizona Incorporated. (MFR)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16873606. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2853-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
May 6, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service by Private Process Server re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Civil Cover Sheet and Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial upon McKesson Specialty Arizona Incorporated on 4/2/2019 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 4/3/2019). (MFR) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warner Lambert Company LLC. (Hendricks, John) (MFR)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parke, Davis & Company. (Hendricks, John) (MFR)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pharmacia Corporation. (Hendricks, John) (MFR)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pfizer Incorporated. (Hendricks, John) (MFR)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-005964. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16873606 filed by Warner Lambert Company, Pharmacia Corporation, Pfizer Incorporated, Warner Lambert Company LLC, Parke, Davis & Company. (Hendricks, John) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tallis et al v. Pfizer Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Lambert Company LLC
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Sharon L Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jeffrey H Horowitz
Represented By: Sharon D Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parke, Davis & Company
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Sharon L Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jeffrey H Horowitz
Represented By: Sharon D Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Incorporated
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Sharon L Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jeffrey H Horowitz
Represented By: Sharon D Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Speciality Arizona Incorporated
Represented By: Stephen E Oertle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Sharon L Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jeffrey H Horowitz
Represented By: Sharon D Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Lambert Company
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Sharon L Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jeffrey H Horowitz
Represented By: Sharon D Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meredith Tallis
Represented By: Connor G Sheehan
Represented By: Robert A Mosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger West
Represented By: Connor G Sheehan
Represented By: Robert A Mosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?