United States of America v. Harkey et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Mountain Park Ranch Homeowners Association, Donald B Harkey, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, Bonnie L Bluth, Maricopa, County of and Maricopa County Treasurer
Case Number: 2:2019cv02914
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 05/31/2019 to Mountain Park Ranch Homeowners Association . (Stevko, Alexander)
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 05/31/2019 to Bonnie Bluth . (Stevko, Alexander)
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 05/31/2019 to Donald Harkey . (Stevko, Alexander)
July 5, 2019 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: Proof of Service re: summons and complaint upon Maricopa County Treasurer on 06/06/2019. (Stevko, Alexander)
July 5, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: Proof of Service re: summons and complaint upon JPMorgan Chase, N.A. on 06/03/2019. (Stevko, Alexander)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' stipulation (Doc. #11 ) and granting Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. a one-time extension of time until July 25, 2019 to respond to the complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's response to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/2/19. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #7 Amended Complaint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint (First Request) by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maskovich, Jacob)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Maricopa County Treasurer. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Submitted by United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by United States of America . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stevko, Alexander)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 *AMENDED COMPLAINT to foreclose tax liens against Bonnie L Bluth, Donald B Harkey, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, Mountain Park Ranch Homeowners Association, Maricopa County Treasurer filed by United States of America.(Stevko, Alexander) *Modified docket text to remove Maricopa, County of on 5/30/2019 (SST).
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on August 7, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 3. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 5/8/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bonnie L Bluth, Donald B Harkey, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, Maricopa, County of, Mountain Park Ranch Homeowners Association. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W. Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2914-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(KEP)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Foreclose Federal Tax Liens filed by United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Harkey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Park Ranch Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald B Harkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Jacob Alexander Maskovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie L Bluth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alexander Edward Stevko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?