Bottega v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al

Plaintiff: Linda Bottega
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC and First National Bank of Omaha Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv02940
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant First National Bank of Omaha Incorporated. (Laszlo, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/5/2019. (MMO)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First National Bank of Omaha Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent First National of Nebraska, Inc. for First National Bank of Omaha Incorporated. (Laszlo, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by First National Bank of Omaha Incorporated.(Laszlo, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Fernanda Hubbard on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC. (Hubbard, Maria)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Linda Bottega: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 05/09/2019 to Equifax Information Services, LLC . (McBride, Ryan)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/9/2019. (MMO)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, First National Bank of Omaha Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16887794. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2940-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Linda Bottega. (McBride, Ryan) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DLC)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16887794 filed by Linda Bottega. (McBride, Ryan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bottega v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Melissa S Ho
Represented By: Maria Fernanda Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Omaha Incorporated
Represented By: Michael J Laszlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Bottega
Represented By: Ryan Lee McBride
Represented By: David James McGlothlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?