Zaragoza v. Talcott Resolution Life Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Octavio Llano Zaragoza
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Talcott Resolution Life Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv02949
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Octavio Llano Zaragoza.(Vielledent, Ricardo)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER pursuant to #15 the parties' Stipulation Re Filing and Responding to First Amended Complaint (FAC), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Zaragoza shall file his FAC by 6/14/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Talcott Resolution Life, Inc. is relieved from filing a response to the initial complaint in light of the forthcoming FAC and that it shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the FAC no later than 30 days after the FAC is filed. If no FAC is filed by 6/14/2019, the answer or other response to the initial complaint is due by 6/21/2019. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 6/12/2019. (RMW)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION re Filing and Responding to First Amended Complaint by Talcott Resolution Life Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradham, Erin)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDARD CIVIL TRACK INITIAL ORDER - The parties must comply with Gen. Ord. No. 17-08 (D. Ariz. Apr. 14, 2017) regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses. See Order for further details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/23/19. (DXD)
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge James A. Teilborg. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-2949-PHX-JAT. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 15, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Ricardo E Vielledent on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 6/14/19 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 5/14/19. (DXD)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 5/14/19. (DXD)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Talcott Resolution Life Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradham, Erin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Talcott Resolution Life Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16889427. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-02949-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached.(BAC)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Talcott Resolution Life Incorporated. (Bradham, Erin) (BAC)
May 8, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Arbitration upon Talcott Resolution Life, Incorporated on 4/8/19(original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 4/8/19).(BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-16889427 filed by Talcott Resolution Life Incorporated. (Bradham, Erin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit State Court Record)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zaragoza v. Talcott Resolution Life Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talcott Resolution Life Incorporated
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Bradham
Represented By: Monica Renee Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavio Llano Zaragoza
Represented By: Alejandro Perez
Represented By: Ricardo Eduardo Vielledent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?