Radix Law PLC v. Mullen

Appellee: Brian J Mullen
Appellant: Radix Law PLC
Debtor: My Vintage Venue LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02984
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Radix Law PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Frutkin, Jonathan)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: The appellant shall serve and file an opening brief with the Clerk, United States District Court, within fourteen (14) days of the date this order is filed. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/6/2019. (MMO)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF READINESS. The Record on Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court is complete. The Bankruptcy Court shall retain the record. The filing of this Certificate constitutes the date of entry of the appeal on the docket in the District Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (GMP)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 *Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court (Bankruptcy Appellate Panel file) by Brian J Mullen. (GMP) *Modified file date from 5/10/19 to 5/9/19; NEF regenerated on 5/10/2019 (SCH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radix Law PLC v. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Brian J Mullen
Represented By: Adam Bennett Nach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Radix Law PLC
Represented By: Carolyn R Tatkin
Represented By: Jonathan B Frutkin
Represented By: Adam Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: My Vintage Venue LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?