Concept Commercial Construction v. Maxum Indemnity Company, et al
Plaintiff: Concept Commercial Construction
Defendant: Maxum Indemnity Company and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2019cv03110
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Defendant having filed a Notice of Settlement (Doc. #14 ); IT IS ORDERED that this matter will be dismissed with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this Order unless a notice of dismissal is filed prior to the dismissal date. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/12/19. (MAW)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement by Maxum Indemnity Company. (Barnard, Catherine)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Maxum Indemnity Company: Maxum Indemnity Company, 2720 E. Camelback Rd., Suite 210, Phoenix, AZ 85016. (Barnard, Catherine)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Concept Commercial Construction. (Barrett, Kevin)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until June 14, 2019 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/23/19. (MAW)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan R. Bolton. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-3110-PHX-SRB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 *STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Maxum Indemnity Company to Respond to Complaint by Maxum Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Barnard, Catherine) *Modified to correct even type on 5/22/2019 (EJA).
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maxum Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Maxum Indemnity Company. (Barnard, Catherine)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Concept Commercial Construction. (DLC)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Maxum Indemnity Company. (DLC)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16915116. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-3110-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (DLC)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-003091. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16915116 filed by Maxum Indemnity Company. (Barnard, Catherine) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Concept Commercial Construction v. Maxum Indemnity Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxum Indemnity Company
Represented By: Catherine Tonsich Barnard
Represented By: Jorge Alberto Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concept Commercial Construction
Represented By: Kevin Charles Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?