Love et al v. Safeco Insurance et al

Plaintiff: Christina Love and Chris Love
Defendant: Safeco Insurance, Unknown Parties and Liberty Mutual Holding Company Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv03118
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re: #10 Second MOTION to Remand to State Court , #8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Safeco Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Stafford, Karen)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER pursuant to #11 Stipulation vacating the Rule 16 Conference currently set for July 26, 2019. If Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand #10 is denied, the Rule 16 Conference will be reset to a date following the Court's ruling. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED staying all other case deadlines, including the deadline for the parties to respond to Mandatory Initial Discovery ("MIDP") and the deadline for the parties to submit a Joint Case Management Report pending the Court's ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. If Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is denied, the Court will issue an Order resetting those deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/19/19. (CLB)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Stipulated Motion to Continue the Rule 16 Conference and Stay all Case Deadlines Pending the Court's Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Safeco Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stafford, Karen)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 * Second (Amended) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Christina Love, Chris Love. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit complaint)(Collins, Michael) * Modified to correct event, add additional filer and remove ex parte designation; attorney noticed on 6/11/2019 (LAD).
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Christina Love. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMP)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 *First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Christina Love. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit complaint)(Collins, Michael) *Modified to remove ex parte designation on 6/7/2019 (GMP).
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Safeco Insurance.(Meyer, Cassandra)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 7/26/2019 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/16/19. (MSA)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on August 14, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/16/19. (MSA)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16917038. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-03118-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance. (Meyer, Cassandra) (BAC)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-006074. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-16917038 filed by Safeco Insurance. (Meyer, Cassandra) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit A-F)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love et al v. Safeco Insurance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Love
Represented By: Michael Anthony Collins
Represented By: Gil Cruz Negrete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Love
Represented By: Michael Anthony Collins
Represented By: Gil Cruz Negrete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance
Represented By: Cassandra Victoria Meyer
Represented By: Karen Christine Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Holding Company Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?