Acosta v. Reliance Trust Company et al
Plaintiff: R Alexander Acosta
Defendant: RVR Incorporated, Survivors Trust Created Under the Smalley Revocable Trust Dated July 8, 2004, Randall Smalley, Eric Bensen, Reliance Trust Company, Marital Trust Created Under the Smalley Revocable Trust Dated July 8, 2004, RVR Employee Stock Ownership Plan, Family Trust Created Under the Smalley Revocable Trust Dated July 8, 2004, Robert Smalley, Jr, Robert Smalley, Jr. and Survivor's Trust Created Under the Smalley Revocable Trust Dated July 8, 2004
Case Number: 2:2019cv03178
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Cajer Mason on behalf of Eric Bensen, Family Trust Created Under the Smalley Revocable Trust Dated July 8, 2004, Marital Trust Created Under the Smalley Revocable Trust Dated July 8, 2004, RVR Incorporated, Randall Smalley, Robert Smalley, Jr, Survivor's Trust Created Under the Smalley Revocable Trust Dated July 8, 2004. (Mason, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by R Alexander Acosta: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 05/31/2019 to Survivor's Trust Created Under the Smalley Revocable Trust . (Ballard, G)
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by R Alexander Acosta: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 05/31/2019 to RVR Inc. . (Ballard, G)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by R Alexander Acosta: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 05/31/2019 to Robert Smalley Jr. . (Ballard, G)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by R Alexander Acosta: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 05/31/2019 to Randall Smalley . (Ballard, G)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by R Alexander Acosta: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 05/31/2019 to Smalley Marital Trust . (Ballard, G)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by R Alexander Acosta: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 05/31/2019 to Smalley Family Trust . (Ballard, G)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by R Alexander Acosta: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 05/31/2019 to Eric Bensen . (Ballard, G)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by R Alexander Acosta: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on May 31, 2019 to Reliance Trust Company . (Lund, Eric)
June 11, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for William Bard Brockman on behalf of Reliance Trust Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Rae Maziarz on behalf of Reliance Trust Company. (Maziarz, Jessica)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER:Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the timerequired by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on August 15, 2019. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/17/2019. (TCA)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/17/2019. (TCA)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #5 Miscellaneous Document. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT filed by R Alexander Acosta. (Lund, Eric) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Eric Bensen, Family Trust Created Under the Smalley Revocable Trust Dated July 8, 2004, Marital Trust Created Under the Smalley Revocable Trust Dated July 8, 2004, RVR Employee Stock Ownership Plan, RVR Incorporated, Reliance Trust Company, Randall Smalley, Robert Smalley, Jr, Survivors Trust Created Under the Smalley Revocable Trust Dated July 8, 2004. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-03178-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by R Alexander Acosta. (Lund, Eric) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(BAC)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 *COMPLAINT filed by R Alexander Acosta. (Lund, Eric) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC) *Modified to reflect incorrect document attached, correct Complaint filed at Doc. #5 on 5/17/2019 (SCH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Reliance Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RVR Incorporated
Represented By: Michael Cajer Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Survivors Trust Created Under the Smalley Revocable Trust Dated July 8, 2004
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Smalley
Represented By: Michael Cajer Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Bensen
Represented By: Michael Cajer Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Trust Company
Represented By: Jessica Rae Maziarz
Represented By: William Bard Brockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marital Trust Created Under the Smalley Revocable Trust Dated July 8, 2004
Represented By: Michael Cajer Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RVR Employee Stock Ownership Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Trust Created Under the Smalley Revocable Trust Dated July 8, 2004
Represented By: Michael Cajer Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Smalley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Smalley, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Cajer Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Survivor's Trust Created Under the Smalley Revocable Trust Dated July 8, 2004
Represented By: Michael Cajer Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Eric Carl Lund
Represented By: G Brendan Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?