Suarez v. American Strategic Insurance Corporation

Plaintiff: Jose Suarez
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv03234
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant American Strategic Insurance Corporation. (Bailey, Wyatt)
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #15 Notice. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a) - Forms of Papers. Please note for future filings; information that must be stated upon the first page of every document and may be presented for filing. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE re: Attorney vacation letter by Jose Suarez re: #14 Order, Set/Reset Hearings . (Christoffel, David)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT: Case Management Conference is set for 7/26/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(LMR)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Jose Suarez. (Christoffel, David)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by American Strategic Insurance Corporation.(Bailey, Wyatt)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #9 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel, #10 Notice (Other). Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE re: Notice of Service by Jose Suarez re: #8 Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 1)(Christoffel, David)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David Andrew Christoffel on behalf of Jose Suarez. (Christoffel, David)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY ORDER. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/17/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Parties - Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project)(LAD)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal automated Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant American Strategic Insurance Corporation. (Bailey, Wyatt)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to American Strategic Insurance Corporation. (KEP)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by American Strategic Insurance Corporation. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Strategic Insurance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent ARX Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate Progressive Corporation for American Strategic Insurance Corporation. (Bailey, Wyatt) *Modified record on 5/20/2019 (DXD).
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16928461. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P. Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-3234-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
May 17, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jose Suarez: Notice of Service re: Summons, Complaint and Certification of Compulsory Arbitration upon American Strategic Insurance Corporation on 4/29/2019. (KEP) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-004781. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16928461 filed by American Strategic Insurance Corporation. (Bailey, Wyatt) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suarez v. American Strategic Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Wyatt Matthew Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Suarez
Represented By: David Andrew Christoffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?