Berhorst v. LM Insurance Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Bernice Berhorst
Defendant: Unknown Party, Liberty Mutual Auto and Home Services LLC and LM Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv03316
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER pursuant to #14 Stipulation to Amend Case Caption and Dismiss Defendant: The case caption shall be amended to show LM Insurance Corporation as the named Defendant. Defendant Liberty Mutual Auto and Home Services, LLC is dismissed from the action with prejudice, each party to bear its respective fees and costs. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/28/2019. (MMO)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO AMEND CASE CAPTION AND DISMISS DEFENDANT by Liberty Mutual Auto and Home Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stein, Amy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Auto and Home Services LLC. (Stein, Amy)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER pursuant to #11 Second Stipulation to Continue the August 14, 2019 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2019 is vacated and reset for 8/27/2019 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/13/2019. (MMO)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Liberty Mutual Auto and Home Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stein, Amy)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Continue. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 is VACATED and RESET to 8/14/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/10/19. (CLB)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 * STIPULATION to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for August 8, 2019 by Bernice Berhorst. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed text)(Horne, Thomas) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 6/7/2019 (LAD).
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Liberty Mutual Auto and Home Services LLC. (Stein, Amy)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant LM Insurance Corporation ANSWER to Complaint by Liberty Mutual Auto and Home Services LLC.(Stein, Amy)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/21/2019. (MMO)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/21/2019. (MMO)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16939054. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-3316-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
May 21, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Demand for Jury Trial and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Liberty Mutual Auto and Home Services LLC on 4/22/2019 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 4/24/2019). (MFR) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Auto and Home Services LLC. (Stein, Amy)(MFR)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-053055. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16939054 filed by Liberty Mutual Auto and Home Services LLC. (Stein, Amy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berhorst v. LM Insurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernice Berhorst
Represented By: Thomas C Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Auto and Home Services LLC
Represented By: Amy Lynn Stein
Represented By: Amy Michelle Samberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Amy Lynn Stein
Represented By: Amy Michelle Samberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?