Ivchenko v. Grant et al
Plaintiff: Renee Ivchenko
Defendant: Kyle David Grant, Travis Paul Grant, Mariel Lizette Grant and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2019cv03756
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #5 , Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kyle David Grant, Mariel Lizette Grant, Travis Paul Grant. (Gingras, David)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/30/19. (JAMA)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16972780. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-3756-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
May 29, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint for Damages, Certificate Regarding Compulsory Arbitration, Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial upon Mariel Lizette Grant on 5/16/2019 (Original Filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 5/23/2019). (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-090493. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16972780 filed by Mariel Lizette Grant, Travis Paul Grant, Kyle David Grant. (Gingras, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivchenko v. Grant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Ivchenko
Represented By: Andrew Ivchenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle David Grant
Represented By: David Scott Gingras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Paul Grant
Represented By: David Scott Gingras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariel Lizette Grant
Represented By: David Scott Gingras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?