Curiel v. Phoenix, City of et al
Plaintiff: Lazaro Curiel
Defendant: James Byrd and Phoenix, City of
Case Number: 2:2019cv03833
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns
2 Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants James Byrd, Phoenix, City of. (Graffious, Derek)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and is assigned to the standard track pursuant to Rule 16.2(b)(3) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure and to the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot pursuant to General Order 17-08. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/2/19. (MSA)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by James Byrd, Phoenix, City of.(Graffious, Derek)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (KEP)
May 30, 2019 ***STATE COURTS RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Phoenix, City of on 5/9/2019 (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 5/10/2019) and upon James Byrd on 5/17/2019 (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 5/20/2019). (KEP) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-090824. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16977497 filed by James Byrd, Phoenix, City of. (Graffious, Derek) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curiel v. Phoenix, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Byrd
Represented By: Derek Ryan Graffious
Represented By: John T Masterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Represented By: Derek Ryan Graffious
Represented By: John T Masterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lazaro Curiel
Represented By: Jody Lynn Broaddus
Represented By: Marc Jeffrey Victor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?