Kennedy v. C&J Custom Construction LLC et al
Plaintiff: Spencer Kennedy
Defendant: Jenniffer Lewis, Chad Lewis and C&J Custom Construction LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04378
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Spencer Kennedy: Declaration of Service re: Complaint, Summonses, and Order upon C & J Custom Construction Inc. on 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of attempted service on statutory agent)(Bendau, Clifford)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 6/17/2019. (DGC, nvo)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to C&J Custom Construction LLC, Chad Lewis and Jenniffer Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17005735. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4378-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Spencer Kennedy. (Bendau, Clifford) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17005735 filed by Spencer Kennedy. (Bendau, Clifford) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. C&J Custom Construction LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer Kennedy
Represented By: Christopher Jacob Bendau
Represented By: Clifford Phillip Bendau, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenniffer Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&J Custom Construction LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?