Golden Rule Fasteners Incorporated v. Best Materials LLC
Plaintiff: Golden Rule Fasteners Incorporated
Defendant: Best Materials LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04386
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #17 ), Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Golden Rule Fasteners Incorporated. (McDonough, James)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Counsel for the Plaintiff shall file a status report or application for entry of default within 14 days of the date of this order concerning the statusof this case. Clerk of the Court to terminate this matter on July 22, 2019 without further order of this Court if plaintiff fails to file a statusreport or application for entry of default. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/8/2019. (TCA)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #14 Service Executed filed by Golden Rule Fasteners Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Golden Rule Fasteners Incorporated: Proof of Service re: Complaint, 7.1 Disclosure, Notice of Availability, USPTO Form, Initial Discovery, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Summons upon CT Corporation System-Scott Whaley - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process on June 10, 2019. (McDonough, James) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation on 6/20/2019 (SST).
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/11/2019. (TCA)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on September 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/11/2019. (TCA)
June 7, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for James F McDonough III on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Best Materials LLC. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Golden Rule Fasteners Incorporated. (DXD)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Golden Rule Fasteners Incorporated. (DLC)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Golden Rule Fasteners Incorporated. (Rivera, Jose)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet filed by Golden Rule Fasteners Incorporated. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Golden Rule Fasteners Incorporated. (Rivera, Jose) (DLC)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(DLC)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17006737. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4386-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Golden Rule Fasteners Incorporated. (Rivera, Jose) (DLC)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17006737 filed by Golden Rule Fasteners Incorporated. (Rivera, Jose) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (also filed at Doc. 10) (DLC) Modified on 6/6/2019 (NKS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden Rule Fasteners Incorporated v. Best Materials LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Materials LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Rule Fasteners Incorporated
Represented By: James F McDonough
Represented By: Jose de Jesus Rivera
Represented By: Aaron Mathew Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?