Hayes v. Apotex Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Marianne Hayes
Defendant: Aveva Drug Delivery Systems Incorporated, Apotex Corporation and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2019cv04439
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Marianne Hayes. (Kessler, Eric)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants Apotex Corporation, Aveva Drug Delivery Systems Incorporated. (Satterlee, Galen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apotex Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Aposherm Delaware Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Apotex Holdings Incorporated for Apotex Corporation. (Reynolds, Kenneth) *Modified record on 6/21/2019 (DXD).
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aveva Drug Delivery Systems Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Aposherm Delaware Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Apotex Holdings Incorporated for Aveva Drug Delivery Systems Incorporated. (Reynolds, Kenneth) *Modified record on 6/21/2019 (DXD).
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Subpoena by Marianne Hayes . (Kessler, Eric)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Apotex Corporation, Aveva Drug Delivery Systems Incorporated.(Reynolds, Kenneth) *Modified linkage on 6/17/2019 (DXD).
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE re: Notice of Service on Counsel by Marianne Hayes re: #6 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Kessler, Eric)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/11/2019. (MMO)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/11/2019. (MMO)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 3 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only), #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Apotex Corporation, Aveva Drug Delivery Systems Incorporated. (Reynolds, Kenneth)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet filed by Aveva Drug Delivery Systems Incorporated, Apotex Corporation. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17025252. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4439-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
June 11, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Return of Service re: Summons, First Amended Complaint and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Apotex Corporation on 5/13/2019 and Aveva Drug Delivery Systems Incorporated on 5/16/2019. (Originals filed in Pinal Superior Court on 5/17/2019) (DLC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pinal County Superior Court, case number S1100CV201801989. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17025252 filed by Aveva Drug Delivery Systems Incorporated and Apotex Corporation. (Reynolds, Kenneth) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Apotex Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Hayes
Represented By: Eric Walter Kessler
Represented By: Eric Bryce Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aveva Drug Delivery Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Galen Huntington Satterlee
Represented By: Kenneth Scott Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corporation
Represented By: Galen Huntington Satterlee
Represented By: Kenneth Scott Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?