Gines v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Guy George Gines
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv04479
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Guy George Gines: Notice of Service re: Summons upon William Barr, US Attorney General (06/27/19); Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (06/24/19); Elizabeth Strange, First Assistant US Attorney for the District of Arizona (06/24/19) on 06/27/19; 06/24/19; 06/24/24. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Domestic return receipts and certified mail receipts)(Caldwell, Mark)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ben Porter appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Porter, Ben)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. See attached Order for deadlines and details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/20/19. (JAMA)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action shall be dismissed without further notice after September 17, 2019, unless before then Plaintiff has properly served Defendant with the Summons and Complaint and has filed with the Clerk of the Court proof thereof pursuant to Rule 4(l) or has shown good cause for the failure to timely serve. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/20/19. (JAMA)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is responsible for service of the Summons and Complaint on Defendant pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and may serve the Summons and Complaint by waiver under Rule 4 (d). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/20/19. (CLB)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4479-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Guy George Gines. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MFR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Guy George Gines. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MFR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Guy George Gines. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gines v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy George Gines
Represented By: Mark Ross Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Ben Alexander Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?