Panaccione et al v. Aldonex Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Panaccione and Gregory Panaccione
Defendant: Steven Oliver, Aldonex Incorporated, Unknown Parties and Unknown Oliver
Case Number: 2:2019cv04483
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Alexander Joseph Lindvall. (Lindvall, Alexander)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) 1st Supplemental filed by Plaintiffs Gregory Panaccione, Jennifer Panaccione. (Breyer, Mark)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 * NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Gregory Panaccione, Jennifer Panaccione. (Breyer, Mark) * Modified to add additional filer; attorney noticed on 7/18/2019 (LAD).
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants Aldonex Incorporated, Steven Oliver. (Moran, Courtney)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Aldonex Incorporated. (Moran, Courtney)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/17/2019. (MMO)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/17/2019. (MMO)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aldonex Incorporated. (Moran, Courtney)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Aldonex Incorporated.(Moran, Courtney)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Steven Oliver, Aldonex Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Aldonex Incorporated. (KEP)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17051190. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L. Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4483-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-006511. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17051190 filed by Steven Oliver, Aldonex Incorporated. (Moran, Courtney) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Panaccione et al v. Aldonex Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Oliver
Represented By: Courtney Denise Moran
Represented By: Michael William Halvorson
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Lindvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldonex Incorporated
Represented By: Courtney Denise Moran
Represented By: Michael William Halvorson
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Lindvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Panaccione
Represented By: Brian Christopher Fawber
Represented By: Edward Michael Ladley
Represented By: Mark Paul Breyer
Represented By: Mark Ichiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Panaccione
Represented By: Brian Christopher Fawber
Represented By: Edward Michael Ladley
Represented By: Mark Paul Breyer
Represented By: Mark Ichiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?