Boice v. Fortees Salon & Spa LLC et al
Plaintiff: Yukino Angela Boice
Defendant: Fortees Salon & Spa LLC, InfinitiHR West LLC and Edward Osunlalu
Case Number: 2:2019cv04484
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 8/29/19 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/1/19. (DXD)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Yukino Angela Boice: Return of Service re: Complaint upon Edward Osunlalu on July 29, 2019. (Hill, Nathaniel)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by InfinitiHR West LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Uppal, Pavneet)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Yukino Angela Boice: Return of Service re: Complaint upon Infiniti HR West, LLC on July 9, 2019. (Hill, Nathaniel)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Yukino Angela Boice: Return of Service re: Complaint upon Fortees Salon & Spa, LLC on July 9, 2019. (Hill, Nathaniel)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on September 17, 2019. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/20/19. (JAMA)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/20/19. (JAMA)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Fortees Salon & Spa LLC, InfinitiHR West LLC, Edward Osunlalu. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17055304. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4484-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Yukino Angela Boice. (Hill, Nathaniel) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MFR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17055304 filed by Yukino Angela Boice. (Hill, Nathaniel) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Jury Demand, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boice v. Fortees Salon & Spa LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortees Salon & Spa LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InfinitiHR West LLC
Represented By: Pavneet Singh Uppal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Osunlalu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yukino Angela Boice
Represented By: Grant Simeon Cragun
Represented By: Nathaniel James Hill
Represented By: Michael Rhodes Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?