Wild v. Preventive Pest Control Mesa LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Wild
Defendant: Preventive Pest Control Phoenix LLC, Unknown Parties and Preventive Pest Control Mesa LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04500
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Daniel P Wilde on behalf of Defendants Preventive Pest Control Mesa LLC, Preventive Pest Control Phoenix LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Alexander Wild: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 6/21/19 to Preventive Pest Control Phoenix, LLC; Preventive Pest Control Mesa, LLC . (Kim, Jenny)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on September 19, 2019. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/21/19. (JAMA)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/21/19. (JAMA)
June 19, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Jenny Kim and John Tehranian on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Alexander Wild. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Alexander Wild. (Tehranian, John) (ARC)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(ARC)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Preventive Pest Control Mesa LLC, Preventive Pest Control Phoenix LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17065181. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4500-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Alexander Wild. (Tehranian, John) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ARC)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17065181 filed by Alexander Wild. (Tehranian, John) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wild v. Preventive Pest Control Mesa LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preventive Pest Control Phoenix LLC
Represented By: Daniel P Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preventive Pest Control Mesa LLC
Represented By: Daniel P Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Wild
Represented By: Jenny S Kim
Represented By: John Tehranian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?