United Financial Casualty Insurance Company v. Volvo Trucks North America et al
Plaintiff: United Financial Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Volvo Trucks North America, Unknown Parties, Vanguard Truck Holdings LLC and Vanguard Truck Holdings LLC a Georgia Corporation doing business as Vanguard Truck Centers doing business as Vanguard Truck Center of Tucson
Case Number: 2:2019cv04503
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #20 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by United Financial Casualty Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMV)
August 1, 2019 Filing 20 *NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff United Financial Casualty Insurance Company. (Rocco, Joseph) *Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3). Attorney noticed on 8/2/2019 (RMV).
August 1, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Volvo Trucks North America. (Kleifield, Matthew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #16 Notice (Other) filed by United Financial Casualty Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LAD)
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 * NOTICE re: Of Order by United Financial Casualty Insurance Company Court's Order of July 15, 2019 (Motions to Dismiss/Strike). (Rocco, Joseph) * Document not in compliance with Local Rule; attorney noticed on 7/16/2019 (LAD).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/15/2019. (TCA)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 8/30/2019 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/15/2019. (TCA)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan M Brnovich. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-4503-PHX-SMB. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for July 30, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order that Volvo Trucks North America show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/30/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order that United Financial Casualty Insurance Company show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/30/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Volvo Trucks North America. (Kleifield, Matthew)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Volvo Trucks North America.(Kleifield, Matthew)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to United Financial Casualty Insurance Company. (MFR)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17065898. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4503-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (MFR)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Volvo Trucks North America. (Kleifield, Matthew) (MFR)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-053258. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17065898 filed by Volvo Trucks North America. (Kleifield, Matthew) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet - Page 3)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Financial Casualty Insurance Company v. Volvo Trucks North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volvo Trucks North America
Represented By: Jack Curtis Pemberton
Represented By: Matthew David Kleifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Truck Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Truck Holdings LLC a Georgia Corporation doing business as Vanguard Truck Centers doing business as Vanguard Truck Center of Tucson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Financial Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph P Rocco
Represented By: Jason Scott Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?