Martin v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Charles Martin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv04517
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TRIAL. Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett added. Judge Diane J Humetewa no longer assigned to case. All further pleadings shall list the following case number: CV-19-4517-PHX-ESW. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/6/19. (MAP)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Charles Martin: Notice of Service re: Summons upon William Barr, US Attorney General (7/02/2019); Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (07/01/19); Elizabeth Strange, First Assistant US Attorney for the District of Arizona (6/27/2019). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Domestic return receipts and certified mail receipts)(Caldwell, Mark) *Modified to correct service dates on 7/12/2019 (REK).
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Wyeth McAdam appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (McAdam, S)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/21/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17073657. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04517-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Charles Martin. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17073657 filed by Charles Martin. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Martin
Represented By: Mark Ross Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: S Wyeth McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?