Zavala v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Francisco Zavala
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04521
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle
Referring Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Francisco Zavala. (Shumway, G)
August 15, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Deposition of 30(b)(6), filed by Francisco Zavala. (Shumway, G)
August 14, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Francisco Zavala. (Shumway, G)
August 14, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Fischer, C)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting the parties' #17 Stipulation of Dismissal. Plaintiff's punitive damages claim against Defendant FCA US LLC is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/18/19. (CLB)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/18/19. (CLB)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. See attachment for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/18/19. (CLB)
July 18, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Diane J. Humetewa. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-4521-PHX-DJH. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 17, 2019 Filing 19 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 16, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff's Punitive Damages Claim Against FCA US LLC by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by FCA US LLC. (Klein, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC. (Klein, Thomas)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Instructions)(MAP)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Supplement Stipulation to Dismiss Plaintiff's Punitive Damages Claim Against FCA US LLC, #4 Supplement [PROPOSED] Order Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Plaintiff's Punitive Damages)(Klein, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: That counsel having complied with this Court's Order, the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for July 30, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order that Francisco Zavala show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/30/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Francisco Zavala: re: Summons Proof of Service upon FCA US LLC on 06/24/19. (Shumway, G)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Francisco Zavala. (Shumway, G)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17073789. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV19-4521-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Francisco Zavala. (Shumway, G) (MCO)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17073789 filed by Francisco Zavala. (Shumway, G) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zavala v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Zavala
Represented By: Brent Michael Ghelfi
Represented By: G Lynn Shumway
Represented By: Thomas Aaron Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Briana Lynn Campbell
Represented By: Thomas M Klein
Represented By: C Megan Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?