Ellis v. Circle K Stores Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Micheal Ellis
Defendant: Circle K Stores Incorporated, City of Phoenix District Attorney's Office and City of Phoenix Police Department
Case Number: 2:2019cv04525
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter a judgment of dismissal without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff if Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within thirty days of the date of this Order; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and amended complaint; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying without prejudice and with leave to refile Plaintiffs motion to appoint counsel (Doc. #7 ) and motion to allow electronic filing (Doc. #8 ). (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 7/17/19. (LAD)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: That Plaintiff having complied with this Court's Order, the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for July 30, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order that Gregory Micheal Ellis show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/30/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Gregory Micheal Ellis. (GMP)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Gregory Micheal Ellis. (GMP)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (RMV)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04525-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction)(RMV)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Gregory Micheal Ellis. (6 pages) (RMV)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Gregory Micheal Ellis. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (RMV)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Gregory Micheal Ellis. (5 pages) (RMV)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Gregory Micheal Ellis. (6 pages)(RMV)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Circle K Stores Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle K Stores Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Phoenix District Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Phoenix Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Micheal Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?