Murphy v. Fisher
Plaintiff: Julie Murphy
Defendant: Heather Fisher
Case Number: 2:2019cv04526
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 28 Letter re: Remand to Maricopa County Superior Court. Received by the Clerk's Office of the Maricopa County Superior Court on 10/29/2019. (RMV)
October 24, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE re: Remanding this case to the Maricopa County Superior Court. (GMP)
October 22, 2019 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Julie Murphy.(Guy, Steven)
October 22, 2019 Filing 25 Sealed Exhibit 2 to #23 Reply by Julie Murphy. (LAD)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - (1) Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend (Doc. #18 ) is granted; (2) Plaintiff's motion to seal (Doc. #21 ) is granted; (3) Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint by October 29, 2019; (4) Once the amended complaint is filed, the Clerk of Court shall remand this action to Maricopa County Superior Court. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/22/19. (LAD)
October 4, 2019 Filing 23 *REPLY to Response to Motion re: #18 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Julie Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 to P's Reply)(Guy, Steven) *Modified to correct document linkage on 10/7/2019 (RMV).
October 4, 2019 Filing 22 * (Filed at Doc. #25 ) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document Lodged Under Seal re: #21 MOTION to Seal Document . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Julie Murphy. (Guy, Steven) Modified on 10/22/2019 (LAD).
October 4, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Seal Document by Julie Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guy, Steven)
October 4, 2019 Filing 20 *NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Julie Murphy. (Guy, Steven) *Modified to correct event on 10/7/2019 (RMV).
October 1, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re: #18 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Heather Fisher. (Williams, Kelli)
September 17, 2019 Filing 18 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Julie Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 to P's Motion to Amend, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Guy, Steven)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/1/2020. Dispositive motions due by 5/29/2020 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/27/19. (MAW)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the parties' joint Rule 26(f) report (Doc. #15 ), concludes it is unnecessary to hold a Rule 16 Case Management Conference. Accordingly, the Rule 16 Case Management Conference set on August 30, 2019, is vacated. The Court will separately issue the Case Management Order. Counsel are to note at Item 11 of the Case Management Order that the deadlines are real, and the Court will enforce the deadlines set forth in the Order. The parties should plan their litigation activities accordingly. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/27/19. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Julie Murphy. (Guy, Steven)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Julie Murphy. (Guy, Steven)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Heather Fisher. (Williams, Kelli)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the joint motion to continue (Doc. #11 ) is granted. The case management conference is reset from August 14, 2019 to August 30, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/10/19. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Julie Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Guy, Steven)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for August 14, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 601, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/2/19. (MAW)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Heather Fisher.(Williams, Kelli)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY ORDER [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 6/24/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Heather Fisher. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 2 to Amended Notice of Removal)(Williams, Kelli)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that removing Defendant shall file an amended notice of removal properly stating a jurisdictional basis for this action no later than July 5, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendant fails to file an amended notice of removal by July 5, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall remand this action to state court on July 8, 2019 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 6/21/19. (MAW)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant Heather Fisher. (Williams, Kelli)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Heather Fisher. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17075010. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W. Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4526-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-007536. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17075010 filed by Heather Fisher. (Williams, Kelli) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Fisher
Represented By: Kelli Kristin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Murphy
Represented By: Steven S Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?