McLemore v. Ryan et al
Petitioner: Damon P McLemore
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona and Charles L Ryan
Case Number: 2:2019cv04533
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Referring Judge: Steven P Logan
2 Judge: James F Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Petitioner shall have through September 16, 2019 to reply in support of his #1 Petition. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 8/12/2019. (RMV)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) by Attorney General of the State of Arizona, Charles L Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-U)(Hogan, Michelle)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - This matter was recently assigned to the undersigned for preparation of a report and recommendation. To facilitate the resolution of this matter, the Court will adopt a schedule and make orders concerning the filings in this matter. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 7/10/19. (MSA)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Lindsay Hogan on behalf of Attorney General of the State of Arizona, Charles L Ryan. (Hogan, Michelle)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Receipt of Electronic Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Arizona Attorney General on 07/02/19. The Attorney General's Office will file a Notice of Appearance within five (5) business days that identifies the respondents that are represented or, in the alternative, will notify the Court if the Attorney General is not able to accept service for and/or represent any of the named respondents. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Sparks, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Arizona Attorney General Service Order (2254)- The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the #1 Petition and this Order on the Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Arizona by electronic mail pursuant to Rule 4, Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. Respondents must answer the Petition within 40 days of the date of service. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge James F. Metcalf pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/1/19. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Part 2, #3 Part 3)(MSA)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MSA)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254). Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number PHX209485 filed by Damon P McLemore. (59 pages) (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Envelope)(MSA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLemore v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Represented By: Michelle Lindsay Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: Michelle Lindsay Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Damon P McLemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?