Wallach et al v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Dave Briskie, Joel Wallach, Michelle Wallach and Steve Wallach
Defendant: Nicole Johnson and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2019cv04564
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Dave Briskie, Joel Wallach, Michelle Wallach, Steve Wallach: Affidavit of Service re: Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference upon Nicole Johnson on 8/13/2019. (Awerbuch, Eric)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order upon Defendant and file notice of service. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/12/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Dave Briskie, Joel Wallach, Michelle Wallach, Steve Wallach: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Dkt. Nos. 3, 4, 7, 9 upon Nicole Johnson on August 9, 2019. (Awerbuch, Eric)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #8 Ex Parte Motion to Serve Defendant Nicole Johnson by Alternate Service. Plaintiffs shall mail, via certified mail, the Summons, Complaint, and this Order to Defendant at 1436 Langford Road, Gwynn Oak, MD 21207; and Plaintiffs shall email the Summons, Complaint, and this Order to Defendant at nicoleamos@gmail.com. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file an affidavit upon completion of service specifying the date and details on which alternative service has been accomplished. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/8/2019. (LFIG)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 EX PARTE MOTION to Serve Defendant by Alternative Means by Dave Briskie, Joel Wallach, Michelle Wallach, Steve Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit of Service)(Awerbuch, Eric)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiffs serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/26/2019. (LFIG)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nicole Johnson. (KAH). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Joel Wallach, Dave Briskie, Michelle Wallach, Steve Wallach. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KAH)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAH)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17093005. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04564-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Dave Briskie, Joel Wallach, Michelle Wallach, Steve Wallach. (Arhangelsky, Peter) (KAH)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17093005 filed by Steve Wallach, Joel Wallach, Dave Briskie, Michelle Wallach. (Arhangelsky, Peter) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Appendix of Exhibits, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallach et al v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Briskie
Represented By: Joshua Scott Furman
Represented By: Eric Jordan Awerbuch
Represented By: Peter Ayer Arhangelsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Wallach
Represented By: Joshua Scott Furman
Represented By: Eric Jordan Awerbuch
Represented By: Peter Ayer Arhangelsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Wallach
Represented By: Joshua Scott Furman
Represented By: Eric Jordan Awerbuch
Represented By: Peter Ayer Arhangelsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Wallach
Represented By: Joshua Scott Furman
Represented By: Eric Jordan Awerbuch
Represented By: Peter Ayer Arhangelsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?