Canning v. Medtronic Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Canning
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Medtronic Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv04565
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR)
August 6, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand Covidien Holding Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Medtronic Incorporated.(Lloyd, Aaron)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Anthony Canning.(SLQ)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Stipulation for Leave (Doc. #9 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file the lodged amended complaint (Doc. #10 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Medtronic Incorporated's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #6 ) is denied as moot without prejudice. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/23/19. (SLQ)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #9 Stipulation filed by Anthony Canning, #10 Lodged Proposed Document filed by Anthony Canning. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
July 22, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Kelly G Bieri on behalf of defendant Medtronic Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 *FILED at #13 * LODGED Proposed AMENDED COMPLAINT. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Anthony Canning. (Lyons, Richard) Modified on 7/23/2019 (SLQ).
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Anthony Canning. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order)(Lyons, Richard)
July 19, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Kayla A Brewe on behalf of Medtronic Inc. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 19, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Bryan T Pratt on behalf of Medtronic Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Medtronic Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Medtronic PLC for Medtronic Incorporated. (Goodwin, Nicole)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) filed by Medtronic Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Kayla Brewe but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Aaron Lloyd. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMP)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) by Medtronic Incorporated. (Lloyd, Aaron)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(LMR)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Medtronic Incorporated.(BAC)
June 26, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Medtronic Incorporated on 6/6/19 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 6/7/19). (BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17093138. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04565-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-053458. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17093138 filed by Medtronic Incorporated. (Lloyd, Aaron) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canning v. Medtronic Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Incorporated
Represented By: Aaron Thomas Lloyd
Represented By: Nicole Maroulakos Goodwin
Represented By: Kayla A Brewe
Represented By: Bryan T Pratt
Represented By: Kelly G Bieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Canning
Represented By: Richard D Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?