Lara v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Robert Lara
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv04569
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED: USMS Process Receipt and Return re: Summons/ Complaint/ Order upon Commissioner of Social Security Administration. NOTE: No date on green card/ USPS tracking number still in transit. (DXD)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED: USMS Process Receipt and Return re: Summons/ Complaint/ Order upon US District Attorney for the District of Arizona on 8/19/19. (DXD)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (Service Packet) - IT IS ORDERED GRANTING the #2 application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. Service by waiver or service of the summons and complaint shall be at government expense on the defendant by the U.S. Marshal or his authorized representative. The Court directs the following: (1) The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the #1 Complaint, this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for the Defendant. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/28/19. (MSA)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Within 60 days after the answer is filed, Plaintiff must file an Opening Brief. Defendant must file an answering brief within 30 days after service of Plaintiff's opening brief. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within 15 days after service of Defendant's answering brief. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/27/19. (DXD)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04569-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAS)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Robert Lara. (BAS)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Robert Lara.(BAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lara v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?