Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company v. Orbit Irrigation Products LLC et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Defendant: Pro-Mark LLC, Orbit Irrigation Products LLC and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2019cv04583
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Contract: Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 4/24/2020. Dispositive motions due by 5/22/2020. Telephone Trial Conference set for 6/5/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Scheduling conference set for 8/15/2019 is vacated. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 8/8/2019. (TCA)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Defendant Orbit Irrigation Products LLC. (Miner, Vincent)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Stipulation dismissing the claims as to Defendant Pro-Mark, LLC Only, without prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/26/2019. (TCA)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants Orbit Irrigation Products LLC, Pro-Mark LLC. (Smith, Jeffrey)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation for Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Grubbs, Michael)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Pro-Mark Only by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Grubbs, Michael)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Grubbs, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Orbit Irrigation Products LLC, Pro-Mark LLC. (Smith, Jeffrey)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pro-Mark LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lunar Acquisition Corporation for Pro-Mark LLC. (Miner, Vincent)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 8/15/2019 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/28/2019. (TCA)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/28/2019. (TCA)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (MCO)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17100281. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-4583 PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Orbit Irrigation Products LLC identifying Corporate Parent Pro-Mark LLC for Orbit Irrigation Products LLC. (Miner, Vincent) (MCO)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019 007760. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17100281 filed by Pro-Mark LLC, Orbit Irrigation Products LLC. (Miner, Vincent) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MCO)
June 27, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED: ANSWER to Complaint by Orbit Irrigation Products LLC, Pro-Mark LLC. ENTERED IN DISTRICT COURT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES***(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company v. Orbit Irrigation Products LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro-Mark LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Lincoln Smith
Represented By: Vincent Richard Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orbit Irrigation Products LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Lincoln Smith
Represented By: Vincent Richard Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Savoini Fitch
Represented By: Michael P Grubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?