Avrahami et al v. Clark et al
Plaintiff: White Mountain Equities LLC, Chandler One LLC, BYS Company ACC, Feedback Insurance Company LTD, O&E Corporation, Benyamin Avrahami, Junction Development LLC, White Knight Investment ACC, Orna Avrahami and Feedback Insurance Company Limited
Defendant: RMS Solutions Incorporated, John Garcia, Clark & Gentry PLLC, Celia Clark, ACR Solutions Group, Alan Rosenbach, Fennemore Craig PC, Heritor Managment Limited, McEntee & Associates PC, Neil Hiller, Pan American Reinsurance Company Limited and Allen Rosenbach (per doc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04631
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 175 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal #174 , Defendants Heritor Management Limited and Pan American Reinsurance Company Limited are dismissed without prejudice. This Civil Case is now Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF)
September 23, 2021 Filing 174 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. Party Heritor Managment Limited and Pan American Reinsurance Company Limited terminated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simpson, Tyler)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Plaintiff must show cause in writing, no later than September 24, 2021, why this action should not be dismissed as to Defendants Heritor Management Limited and Pan American Reinsurance Company Limited for failure to prosecute, unless an application for entry of judgment pursuant to Rule 55(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is filed within such time.. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/20/21. (SJF)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting #171 Stipulation of Dismissal. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Allen Rosenbach and ACR Solutions Group, Inc. are dismissed from this action with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/11/21. (SJF)
August 10, 2021 Filing 171 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Def. Allen Rosenbach and ACR Solutions Group, Inc. With Prejudice by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Canada, W)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting #169 Stipulation of Dismissal. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Celia Clark and Clark & Gentry, P.L.L.C. are dismissed from this action with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/8/21. (SJF)
July 6, 2021 Filing 169 STIPULATION of Dismissal of All Claims By and Against Clark Defendants Only, With Prejudice by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Canada, W)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation for Dismissal (Doc. #167 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants John Garcia, In His Capacity as Personal Representative for the Estate of Craig McEntee, and McEntee & Associates P.C. are dismissed from this action with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/28/2021. (WLP)
June 17, 2021 Filing 167 STIPULATION of Dismissal of All Claims by and Against McEntee Entities Only, With Prejudice by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Canada, W)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER: Defendants Celia Clark and Clark & Gentry will be dismissed with prejudice from this case on July 12, 2021 unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 6/10/2021. (LMR)
June 10, 2021 Filing 165 NOTICE of Settlement by Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Zerlaut, Scott)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER denying #163 Stipulation for Protective Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/8/2021. (WLP)
June 8, 2021 Filing 163 STIPULATION For Entry of Protective Order by Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zerlaut, Scott)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER: The parties' Stipulated Motion to Extend #159 is granted. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 6/1/2021. (LMR)
May 28, 2021 Filing 161 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1). The name, address, e-mail address, State Bar Attorney number, telephone number, and optionally the fax number, of the attorney appearing for the party in the action or proceeding and whether the attorney appears for the plaintiff, defendant, or other party - in propria persona - must be typewritten or printed in the space to the left of the center of the page and beginning at line one (1) on the first page. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
May 28, 2021 Filing 160 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Deary, David)
May 11, 2021 Filing 159 STIPULATION re: #135 Order, #148 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zerlaut, Scott)
May 7, 2021 Filing 158 MANDATE of USCA Dismissing Appeal re: 21-15337 as to #149 Notice ofInterlocutory Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Order)(DXD)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER: The parties filed a Joint Status Report. The deadlines from this Court's January 26, 2021 Order remain in effect. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 5/7/2021. (LMR)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER that the Stipulation for Dismissal #155 is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Neil Hiller and Fennemore Craig, P.C. are dismissed from this action with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/29/2021. (CLB)
April 29, 2021 Filing 155 STIPULATION of Dismissal of All Claims by and Against Fennemore Entities Only, with Prejudice by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Canada, W)
April 26, 2021 Filing 154 STATUS REPORT JOINT by Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Zerlaut, Scott)
April 19, 2021 Filing 153 ADVANCE DECISION of USCA Dismissing Appeal re: 21-80011 as to #152 Permission to Appeal under 28 U.S.C Section 1292(b).(DXD)
February 26, 2021 Filing 150 USCA Case Number re: #149 Notice of Appeal. Case number 21-15337, Ninth Circuit. (LAD)
February 23, 2021 Filing 149 * NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #135 Order, #147 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-19188474. (Zerlaut, Scott) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 2/23/2021 (LAD).
February 22, 2021 Filing 152 USCA Case Number re: Permission to Appeal under 28 U.S.C Section 1292(b). Case number 21-80011, Ninth Circuit.(DXD)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Interrogatories and Requests for Production #136 is granted. Defendants have until March 22, 2021 to respond to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories and Requests for Production. The deadline for class discovery is extended from February 15, 2021 to June 22, 2021. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file a motion to certify the class is extended from March 5, 2021 to July 22, 2021. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 2/11/2021. (LMR)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Amend Order to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) and to Stay Discovery Order (Doc. #137 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court's January 26, 2021 Order (Doc. #135 ) is stayed pending disposition of the interlocutory appeal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED if the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit does not accept the interlocutory appeal, the parties are ordered to notify the court within ten (10) days to lift the stay. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/11/21. (SLQ)
February 10, 2021 Filing 146 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #137 MOTION Certify for Interlocutory Appeal re: #135 Order filed by Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Zerlaut, Scott)
February 10, 2021 Filing 145 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #136 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Zerlaut, Scott)
February 5, 2021 Filing 144 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #137 MOTION Certify for Interlocutory Appeal re: #135 Order filed by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Simpson, Tyler)
February 5, 2021 Filing 143 RESPONSE to Motion re: #136 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Simpson, Tyler)
February 4, 2021 Filing 142 *WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: #141 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Canada, W) *Modified to correct event on 2/5/2021 (DXD).
February 4, 2021 Filing 141 **WITHDRAWN per Doc. #142 ** NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal Jim L. Flegle filed by Jim L Flegle. (Flegle, Jim) Modified on 2/5/2021 (DXD).
February 4, 2021 Filing 140 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal Jim L. Flegle filed by Jim L Flegle. (Flegle, Jim)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER: The Court's January 26, 2021 Order #135 is stayed pending the Court's decision on the Clark Defendants' Motion to Certify #137 . Plaintiffs have until February 5, 2021 to file a response to both the Motion for Extension of Time #136 and the Motion to Certify #137 . Defendants have until February 10, 2021 to file a reply. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 1/29/2021. (LMR)
January 28, 2021 Filing 138 NOTICE re: Expedited Basis by Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC re: #136 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery . (Zerlaut, Scott)
January 28, 2021 Filing 137 MOTION Certify for Interlocutory Appeal re: #135 Order by Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Zerlaut, Scott)
January 28, 2021 Filing 136 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zerlaut, Scott)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER on Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Re: Plaintiffs' Discovery to Defendants Celia Clark and Clark & Gentry #132 : Defendants' objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories Nos. 15 are overruled. The Clark Defendants have ten days from the date of this Order to answer Plaintiffs' Interrogatories. Defendants' objections to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production Nos. 13 and 6 are overruled. The Clark Defendants have ten days from the date of this Order to produce the requested documents. Defendants' objections to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production Nos. 4, 7, and 9 are sustained only as to documents containing attorney-client communications for purposes of legal advice or attorney work product. The Clark Defendants' have ten days from the date of this Order to produce the requested documents and a Rule 26(b)(5) privilege log for those documents subject to privilege. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 1/26/2021. (LMR)
January 25, 2021 Filing 134 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Steven P Logan: Discovery Dispute Hearing held on 1/25/2021. Argument is presented. The matter is taken under advisement. APPEARANCES: Wilson Wray, Jr. and Tyler Simpson telephonically for Plaintiffs. Benjamin Branson, Scott Zerlaut, Joseph Adams and Parker Bunch telephonically for Defendants. (Court Reporter Elva Cruz-Lauer.) Hearing held 11:25 AM to 11:50 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER: Motion Hearing is set for January 25, 2021 at 11:00 a.m.The Hearing shall be held telephonically. The parties shall jointly email Judge Logan's chambers by Thursday, January 21, 2021 to obtain the call-in information. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 12/14/2020. (LMR)
December 11, 2020 Filing 132 STATEMENT of Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Re: Plaintiffs' Discovery to Def. Celia Clark and Clark & Gentry by Plaintiffs Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Simpson, Tyler)
December 7, 2020 Filing 131 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Heritor Management Limited, Pan American Reinsurance Company Limited. (SLQ)
December 7, 2020 Filing 130 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiffs Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC against Heritor Management, LTD and Pan American Reinsurance Company, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Simpson, Tyler)
November 9, 2020 Filing 129 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendants Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Zerlaut, Scott)
November 6, 2020 Filing 128 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendants Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Zerlaut, Scott)
November 4, 2020 Filing 127 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendants Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Zerlaut, Scott)
October 23, 2020 Filing 126 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by ACR Solutions Group, Alan Rosenbach. (Wittwer, John)
October 23, 2020 Filing 125 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Simpson, Tyler)
October 9, 2020 Filing 124 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Zerlaut, Scott)
October 7, 2020 Filing 123 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendants Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Zerlaut, Scott)
October 2, 2020 Filing 122 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Zerlaut, Scott)
September 28, 2020 Filing 121 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Zerlaut, Scott)
September 25, 2020 Filing 120 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Canada, W)
September 18, 2020 Filing 119 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Zerlaut, Scott)
September 18, 2020 Filing 118 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Canada, W)
September 14, 2020 Filing 117 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Fennemore Craig PC, Neil Hiller. (Eckert-Fong, Rebecca)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER: The Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute is granted to the extent stated in the attached Order. Plaintiffs are not required to file a preliminary expert affidavit for ACR and the request for a stay is denied as moot. See order for details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 9/4/2020. (LMR)
September 2, 2020 Filing 112 STATEMENT of Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Re: Preliminary Expert Affidavit and Stay of All Proceedings Until Compliance by Defendants ACR Solutions Group, Alan Rosenbach. (Wittwer, John)
September 1, 2020 Filing 115 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant ACR Solutions Group. (Doc. #111 is being re-docketed with the correct event for statistical purposes). (WLP)
September 1, 2020 Filing 111 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by ACR Solutions Group, Alan Rosenbach. (Wittwer, John)
August 31, 2020 Filing 114 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant McEntee & Associates PC. (Doc. #110 is being re-docketed with the correct event for statistical purposes). (WLP)
August 31, 2020 Filing 113 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Doc. #109 is being re-docketed with the correct event for statistical purposes). (WLP)
August 31, 2020 Filing 110 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by McEntee & Associates PC. (Bunch, Parker)
August 31, 2020 Filing 109 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Zerlaut, Scott)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 9/24/2021. Dispositive motions due by 11/1/2021. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 8/5/2020. (LMR)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: The Rule 16 Case Management Conference, presently set for August 14, 2020 before Honorable Steven P. Logan, is vacated. Order to follow. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 8/5/2020. (LMR)
August 4, 2020 Filing 106 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiffs Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deary, David)
August 4, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendants Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Zerlaut, Scott)
July 13, 2020 Filing 104 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) First Supplemental filed by Defendants Fennemore Craig PC, Neil Hiller. (Eckert-Fong, Rebecca)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 502, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P. Logan. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 7/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR)
July 6, 2020 Filing 102 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Zerlaut, Scott)
July 6, 2020 Filing 101 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants Fennemore Craig PC, Neil Hiller. (Eckert-Fong, Rebecca)
July 6, 2020 Filing 100 *NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant ACR Solutions Group, Alan Rosenbach. (Demlong, William) *Modified to add filer on 7/7/2020 (EJA).
July 6, 2020 Filing 99 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant John Garcia. (Demlong, William)
July 6, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiffs Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Deary, David)
June 5, 2020 Filing 97 ANSWER to #87 Amended Complaint by McEntee & Associates PC.(Bunch, Parker)
June 5, 2020 Filing 96 ANSWER to #87 Amended Complaint by ACR Solutions Group, Alan Rosenbach.(Wittwer, John)
June 5, 2020 Filing 95 ANSWER to #87 Amended Complaint by Fennemore Craig PC, Neil Hiller.(Adams, Joseph)
June 5, 2020 Filing 94 ANSWER to #87 Amended Complaint by Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC.(Zerlaut, Scott)
May 15, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE re: Notice of Previously Filed First Amended Class Action Complaint by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC . (Simpson, Tyler)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 6/5/2020 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendants' answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/11/2020. (CLB)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 AMENDED ORDER: The Clark Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Strike #28 is granted in part and denied in part. The Hiller Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #31 is granted in part and denied in part. The ACR Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #59 is granted in part and denied in part. The McEntee Defendants' Joinder #36 is stricken as untimely. The McEntee Defendants shall have leave to amend their answer and/or file a Rule 12(c) motion within fourteen (14) days of Plaintiffs filing an amended complaint. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take Jurisdictional Discovery #76 is denied. The Complaint #1 is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs shall have thirty days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint. If no amended complaint is filed within 30 days, the Clerk of the Court shall, without further Court order, dismiss this case with prejudice. See order for details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/8/2020. (LMR)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #85 Motion for Clarification. See order for details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/8/2020. (LMR)
May 8, 2020 Filing 89 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Fennemore Craig PC, Neil Hiller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Joseph)
April 30, 2020 Filing 88 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Deary, David)
April 30, 2020 Filing 87 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by O&E Corporation, Orna Avrahami, Benyamin Avrahami, Junction Development LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC.(Deary, David)
April 17, 2020 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin John Branson on behalf of ACR Solutions Group, Alan Rosenbach. (Branson, Benjamin)
April 8, 2020 Filing 85 MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF ORDER [DKT. 83] re: #83 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Discovery by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Simpson, Tyler)
April 1, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Parker Conlan Bunch on behalf of McEntee & Associates PC. (Bunch, Parker)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 *AMENDED BY DOC. #91 * ORDER: The Clark Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Strike #28 is granted in part and denied in part. The Hiller Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #31 is granted in part and denied in part. The ACR Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #59 is granted in part and denied in part. The McEntee Defendants' Joinder #36 is stricken as untimely. The McEntee Defendants shall have leave to amend their answer and/or file a Rule 12(c) motion within fourteen (14) days of Plaintiffs filing an amended complaint. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take Jurisdictional Discovery #76 is denied. The Complaint #1 is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs shall have thirty days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint. If no amended complaint is filed within 30 days, the Clerk of the Court shall, without further Court order, dismiss this case with prejudice. See order for details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/31/2020. (LMR) Modified on 5/8/2020 (LMR).
January 22, 2020 Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #76 MOTION for Discovery Regarding Defendants Rosenbach and ACR Solutions Group filed by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Deary, David)
January 21, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by James Alton Bloom on behalf of Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Bloom, James)
January 15, 2020 Filing 80 RESPONSE to Motion re: #76 MOTION for Discovery Regarding Defendants Rosenbach and ACR Solutions Group filed by ACR Solutions Group, Alan Rosenbach. (Wittwer, John)
January 15, 2020 Filing 79 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss AZ Rico Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ACR Solutions Group, Alan Rosenbach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wittwer, John)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER: The Stipulation #77 is granted. Defendants shall have until January 15, 2020 to file both their Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Jurisdictional Discovery #76 and their Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss #59 . Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 12/17/2019. (LMR)
December 16, 2019 Filing 77 *Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #76 MOTION for Discovery, REPLY to Response to Motion re: #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ACR Solutions Group, Alan Rosenbach. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wittwer, John) *Modified to correct event on 12/16/2019 (REK).
December 5, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION for Discovery Regarding Defendants Rosenbach and ACR Solutions Group by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deary, David)
December 5, 2019 Filing 75 RESPONSE to Motion re: #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss AZ Rico Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , RESPONSE in Opposition re: #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss AZ Rico Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6)(McKenzie, John)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: The Stipulation to Exceed #73 is granted. The parties are granted an additional five pages each for both the Response and Reply to the pending Motion to Dismiss #59 . Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 12/2/2019. (LMR)
December 2, 2019 Filing 73 STIPULATION re: #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss AZ Rico Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simpson, Tyler)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: Defendant RMS Solutions, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice. Defendant RMS Solutions, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss #43 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/25/2019. (LMR)
November 22, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. Party RMS Solutions Incorporated terminated. (Simpson, Tyler)
November 12, 2019 Filing 70 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons,Complaint, Preliminary Order, Notice of MIDP, Order Granting Substitute Service upon Pan American Reinsurance Company, Ltd. on 11/08/2019. (Simpson, Tyler)
November 12, 2019 Filing 69 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons,Complaint, Preliminary Order, Notice of MIDP, Order Granting Substitute Service upon Heritor Management, Ltd. on 11/08/2019. (Simpson, Tyler)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: The Stipulation for Extension #64 is granted. Plaintiffs shall have until December 5, 2019 to file a Response to the Motion to Dismiss #59 . Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/5/2019. (LMR)
November 4, 2019 Filing 67 *REPLY re: #53 Response to #36 Joinder by Defendant John Garcia, McEntee & Associates PC. (Demlong, William) *Modified to add additional document link on 11/5/2019 (REK). *Modified to add filer on 12/13/19.
November 4, 2019 Filing 66 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Fennemore Craig PC, Neil Hiller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(Adams, Joseph)
November 4, 2019 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Strike filed by Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Zerlaut, Scott)
November 4, 2019 Filing 64 STIPULATION re: #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss AZ Rico Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simpson, Tyler)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: The Court's Order #50 is satisfied and no further action will be taken by the Court at this time. Plaintiffs' Motion for Substitute Service #54 is granted. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this order authorizing service with the Summons and Complaint. Plaintiffs shall promptly effect service as authorized by this order and file proof of service no later than December 2, 2019. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/1/2019. (LMR)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER: The Stipulation for Extension #61 is granted. Plaintiffs shall have until November 25, 2019 to file a Response to the Motion to Dismiss #43 . Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/1/2019. (LMR)
October 31, 2019 Filing 61 STIPULATION re: #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss AZ Rico Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simpson, Tyler)
October 22, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE re: Certificate of Compliance With LRCIV 12.1(C) by ACR Solutions Group, Alan Rosenbach re: #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss AZ Rico Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction . (Wittwer, John)
October 22, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss AZ Rico Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by ACR Solutions Group, Alan Rosenbach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wittwer, John). *Added MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on 10/23/2019 (EJA).
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Stipulation: Plaintiff shall have until November 4, 2019 to file a Response to RMS Solutions, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss #43 . Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/16/2019. (LMR)
October 16, 2019 Filing 57 STIPULATION re: #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss AZ Rico Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simpson, Tyler)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting the Stipulation #55 . Defendants shall have until November 4, 2019, to file Replies to their Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #28 , #31 , #36 ). See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/15/2019. (LMR)
October 15, 2019 Filing 55 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Fennemore Craig PC, Neil Hiller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Joseph)
October 14, 2019 Filing 54 *RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #50 Order, MOTION for Substitute Service on Defendants Heritor Management Limited and Pan American Reinsurance Company Limited by Plaintiffs Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Deary, David) *Modified to add Motion for Substitute Service on 10/15/2019 (REK).
October 14, 2019 Filing 53 RESPONSE re: #36 Joinder by Plaintiffs Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Deary, David)
October 14, 2019 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Deary, David)
October 14, 2019 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Strike , RESPONSE to Motion re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Strike filed by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Deary, David)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: On or before October 14, 2019, Plaintiffs must show cause why Defendants Heritor Management Limited or Pan American Reinsurance Company Limited should not be dismissed for failure to comply with Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/7/2019. (LMR)
September 30, 2019 Filing 49 *NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant John Garcia, McEntee & Associates PC. (Demlong, William) *Modified to add additional filer on 10/1/2019 (REK).
September 30, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiffs Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Deary, David)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2019. ORDERED that the parties' obligation to submit the Joint Rule 26(f) Case Management Report and Joint Proposed Rule 16 Case Management Order is suspended. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Rule 16 Case Management Conference will be reset after the Court rules on the pending motions to dismiss (Docs. #28 , #31 , #43 ). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/26/2019. (LFIG)
September 23, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Case Management Conference (Unopposed) by Fennemore Craig PC, Neil Hiller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Adams, Joseph)
September 20, 2019 Filing 45 REPORT of Certificate of Good Faith Conference for Motion to Dismiss re: #43 by Defendant RMS Solutions Incorporated. (Nash, Jeanna)
September 20, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE re: of Filing by RMS Solutions Incorporated re: #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss AZ Rico Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Exhibit A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Nash, Jeanna)
September 20, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss AZ Rico Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by RMS Solutions Incorporated. (Nash, Jeanna)
September 20, 2019 Filing 42 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/23/2019 to Allen Rosenbach . (Deary, David) *Modified to correct sent date on 9/23/2019 (REK).
September 20, 2019 Filing 41 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/23/2019 to ACR Solutions Group . (Deary, David) *Modified to correct sent date on 9/23/2019 (REK).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: The Stipulation #39 is granted. Plaintiffs shall have until October 14, 2019 to file a Response to the Joinder in Defendants' Motions to Dismiss #36 . Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/16/2019. (LMR)
September 16, 2019 Filing 39 STIPULATION re: #36 Joinder by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simpson, Tyler)
September 16, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Samuel K Allen on behalf of Defendant RMS Solutions Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference is set for 10/11/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. See order for details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(LMR)
September 6, 2019 Filing 37 REPORT of Certificate of Compliance with LRCiv 12.1(c) by Defendant John Garcia, McEntee & Associates PC. (Demlong, William) *Modified to add filer on 12/13/2019 (DXD).
September 6, 2019 Filing 36 *STRICKEN PURSUANT TO #83 * Joinder re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Strike, #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant John Garcia, McEntee & Associates PC. (Demlong, William) *Modified to add filer on 12/13/2019 (DXD). Modified on 3/31/2020 (LMR).
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: The Stipulations #33 , #34 are granted. Plaintiff shall have until October 14, 2019 to file Responses to the pending Motions to Dismiss #28 , #31 . Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/5/2019. (LMR)
September 4, 2019 Filing 34 STIPULATION re: #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Deary, David)
September 4, 2019 Filing 33 STIPULATION re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Strike by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Deary, David)
August 30, 2019 Filing 32 REPORT of Certificate of Good Faith Conference re: #31 by Defendants Fennemore Craig PC, Neil Hiller. (Adams, Joseph)
August 30, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Fennemore Craig PC, Neil Hiller. (Adams, Joseph)
August 30, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by John Garcia.(Demlong, William)
August 30, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Ellen Eckert-Fong on behalf of Fennemore Craig PC, Neil Hiller. (Eckert-Fong, Rebecca)
August 30, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Zerlaut, Scott)
August 22, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Matthew L Lalli on behalf of Defendants Fennemore Craig PC, Neil Hiller. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The Amended Stipulation #25 is granted. Defendant RMS Solutions, Inc.'s time to respond to the complaint is extended to September 20, 2019. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the 30-day extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/20/2019. (LMR)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The Stipulation #25 is granted. Defendant RMS Solutions, Inc. shall have until September 20, 2019, to file an answer to the Complaint or otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/20/2019. (LMR)
August 16, 2019 Filing 25 *Amended STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (First Request) by RMS Solutions Incorporated. (Nash, Jeanna) *Modified to correct event and text on 8/19/2019 (REK).
August 16, 2019 Filing 24 *STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT for (First Request) by RMS Solutions Incorporated. (Nash, Jeanna) *Modified to correct event on 8/19/2019 (REK).
August 16, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanna Chandler Nash on behalf of RMS Solutions Incorporated. (Nash, Jeanna)
August 16, 2019 Filing 22 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project & General Order, Preliminary Order upon RSM Solutions on 7/30/2019. (Deary, David)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The Stipulation to Extend #20 is granted. Defendants Fennemore Craig and Neil Hiller's time to respond to the complaint is extended to August 30, 2019. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/31/2019. (LMR)
July 31, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Fennemore Craig PC, Neil Hiller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Joseph)
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph G Adams on behalf of Fennemore Craig PC, Neil Hiller. (Adams, Joseph)
July 31, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Donna Lee on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The Stipulation to Extend #17 is granted. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendants' answer to the complaint after the extension. Defendants Celia Clark and Clark & Gentry PLLC's time to respond to the complaint is extended to August 30, 2019. No further extensions will be granted. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/30/2019. (LMR)
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zerlaut, Scott)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Michael Zerlaut on behalf of Celia Clark, Clark & Gentry PLLC. (Zerlaut, Scott)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, General Order, Preliminary Order upon Clark & Gentry, PLLC on 07/16/2019. (Deary, David)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company Limited, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, General Order, Preliminary Order upon Celia Clark on 07/23/2019. (Deary, David)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER pursuant to Stipulated Request for Extension of Time to Answer #12 : The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. Defendants John Garcia, In His Capacity as Personal Representative for the Estate of Craig McEntee, and McEntee & Associates' time to respond to the complaint is extended to August 30, 2019. No further extensions will be granted. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/26/2019. (LMR)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (First Request) by John Garcia, McEntee & Associates PC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Demlong, William)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company LTD, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC: Return of Service re: Summons; Complaint; Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project; Preliminary Order upon McEntee & Associates, P.C. on 07/12/2019. (Deary, David)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company LTD, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC: Return of Service re: Summons; Complaint; Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project; Preliminary Order upon Neil Hiller on 07/11/2019. (Deary, David)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company LTD, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC: Return of Service re: Complaint; Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project; Preliminary Order upon Craig Fennemore c/o FC Service Corporation on 07/10/2019. (Deary, David)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company LTD, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC: Certificate of Service re: Complaint; Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilor Project; Preliminary Order upon John Garcia, as Personal Representative of Estate of Craig McEntee on 07/09/2019. (Deary, David)
July 15, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Wilson Wray, John McKenzie, David Deary, Jim Flegle, William Canada, and Tyler Simpson on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on October 1, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(LMR)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(KAH). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17122595. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4631-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Benyamin Avrahami, Orna Avrahami, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC, Feedback Insurance Company LTD, Junction Development LLC, O&E Corporation, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC. (Wotkyns, Garrett) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(KAH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by O&E Corporation.(Wotkyns, Garrett) (KAH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17122595 filed by O&E Corporation, Orna Avrahami, Benyamin Avrahami, Junction Development LLC, Feedback Insurance Company LTD, White Knight Investment ACC, White Mountain Equities LLC, BYS Company ACC, Chandler One LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avrahami et al v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White Mountain Equities LLC
Represented By: John William McKenzie
Represented By: Tyler M Simpson
Represented By: Garrett Webster Wotkyns
Represented By: Donna Lee
Represented By: W Ralph Canada, Jr.
Represented By: Jim L Flegle
Represented By: David Ray Deary
Represented By: Wilson E Wray, Jr.
Represented By: James Alton Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandler One LLC
Represented By: John William McKenzie
Represented By: Tyler M Simpson
Represented By: Garrett Webster Wotkyns
Represented By: Donna Lee
Represented By: W Ralph Canada, Jr.
Represented By: Jim L Flegle
Represented By: David Ray Deary
Represented By: Wilson E Wray, Jr.
Represented By: James Alton Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BYS Company ACC
Represented By: John William McKenzie
Represented By: Tyler M Simpson
Represented By: Garrett Webster Wotkyns
Represented By: Donna Lee
Represented By: W Ralph Canada, Jr.
Represented By: Jim L Flegle
Represented By: David Ray Deary
Represented By: Wilson E Wray, Jr.
Represented By: James Alton Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feedback Insurance Company LTD
Represented By: John William McKenzie
Represented By: Tyler M Simpson
Represented By: Garrett Webster Wotkyns
Represented By: Donna Lee
Represented By: W Ralph Canada, Jr.
Represented By: Jim L Flegle
Represented By: David Ray Deary
Represented By: Wilson E Wray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O&E Corporation
Represented By: John William McKenzie
Represented By: Tyler M Simpson
Represented By: Garrett Webster Wotkyns
Represented By: Donna Lee
Represented By: W Ralph Canada, Jr.
Represented By: Jim L Flegle
Represented By: David Ray Deary
Represented By: Wilson E Wray, Jr.
Represented By: James Alton Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benyamin Avrahami
Represented By: John William McKenzie
Represented By: Tyler M Simpson
Represented By: Garrett Webster Wotkyns
Represented By: Donna Lee
Represented By: W Ralph Canada, Jr.
Represented By: Jim L Flegle
Represented By: David Ray Deary
Represented By: Wilson E Wray, Jr.
Represented By: James Alton Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junction Development LLC
Represented By: John William McKenzie
Represented By: Tyler M Simpson
Represented By: Garrett Webster Wotkyns
Represented By: Donna Lee
Represented By: W Ralph Canada, Jr.
Represented By: Jim L Flegle
Represented By: David Ray Deary
Represented By: Wilson E Wray, Jr.
Represented By: James Alton Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White Knight Investment ACC
Represented By: John William McKenzie
Represented By: Tyler M Simpson
Represented By: Garrett Webster Wotkyns
Represented By: Donna Lee
Represented By: W Ralph Canada, Jr.
Represented By: Jim L Flegle
Represented By: David Ray Deary
Represented By: Wilson E Wray, Jr.
Represented By: James Alton Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orna Avrahami
Represented By: John William McKenzie
Represented By: Tyler M Simpson
Represented By: Garrett Webster Wotkyns
Represented By: Donna Lee
Represented By: W Ralph Canada, Jr.
Represented By: Jim L Flegle
Represented By: David Ray Deary
Represented By: Wilson E Wray, Jr.
Represented By: James Alton Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feedback Insurance Company Limited
Represented By: John William McKenzie
Represented By: Tyler M Simpson
Represented By: Donna Lee
Represented By: Wilson E Wray, Jr.
Represented By: Garrett Webster Wotkyns
Represented By: W Ralph Canada, Jr.
Represented By: Jim L Flegle
Represented By: David Ray Deary
Represented By: James Alton Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMS Solutions Incorporated
Represented By: Jeanna Chandler Nash
Represented By: Abigail Reinard Wolberg
Represented By: Samuel K Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Garcia
Represented By: William M Demlong
Represented By: John Kristian Wittwer
Represented By: Parker Conlan Bunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark & Gentry PLLC
Represented By: Thomas J Shorall, Jr.
Represented By: Scott Michael Zerlaut
Represented By: Paul Joseph McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celia Clark
Represented By: Thomas J Shorall, Jr.
Represented By: Scott Michael Zerlaut
Represented By: Paul Joseph McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACR Solutions Group
Represented By: John Kristian Wittwer
Represented By: William M Demlong
Represented By: Benjamin John Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Rosenbach
Represented By: William M Demlong
Represented By: John Kristian Wittwer
Represented By: Benjamin John Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fennemore Craig PC
Represented By: Joseph G Adams
Represented By: Rebecca Ellen Eckert-Fong
Represented By: Matthew L Lalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritor Managment Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McEntee & Associates PC
Represented By: William M Demlong
Represented By: John Kristian Wittwer
Represented By: Parker Conlan Bunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Hiller
Represented By: Joseph G Adams
Represented By: Rebecca Ellen Eckert-Fong
Represented By: Matthew L Lalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pan American Reinsurance Company Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Rosenbach (per doc.
Represented By: John Kristian Wittwer
Represented By: William M Demlong
Represented By: Benjamin John Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?