Epic Produce Sales LLC v. Oh-So Fresh Food Service LLC et al
Plaintiff: Epic Produce Sales LLC
Defendant: Pablo M Nava, Nava Investment Holdings LLC and Oh-So Fresh Food Service LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04640
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Epic Produce Sales LLC. (Botta, Bart)
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counts 8 and 9 by Pablo M Nava, Nava Investment Holdings LLC, Oh-So Fresh Food Service LLC. (Allen, Thomas)
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pablo M Nava, Nava Investment Holdings LLC, Oh-So Fresh Food Service LLC. (Allen, Thomas)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Pablo M Nava, Nava Investment Holdings LLC, Oh-So Fresh Food Service LLC.(Allen, Thomas)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Bart M Botta. (Botta, Bart)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE re: of Service by Epic Produce Sales LLC re: #12 Order, Set/Reset Hearings . (Botta, Bart)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 9/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/10/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Epic Produce Sales LLC: Certificate of Service re: Order Re Motions Filed Under FRCP 12(b) upon Oh-So Fresh Food Service, LLC; Pablo M. Nava; and Nava Investment Holdings, LLC on 07/09/2019. (Botta, Bart)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Epic Produce Sales LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice of Availability of US Magistrate Judge, Notice to Parties Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project upon Nava Investment Holdings, LLC on 07/05/2019. (Botta, Bart)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Epic Produce Sales LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice of Availability of US Magistrate Judge, Notice to Parties Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project upon Pablo M. Nava, an individual on 07/05/2019. (Botta, Bart)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Epic Produce Sales LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice of Availability of US Magistrate Judge, Notice to Parties Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project upon Oh-So Fresh Food Service, LLC on 07/05/2019. (Botta, Bart)
July 9, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Bart Botta on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/5/2019. (LFIG)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Pablo M Nava, Nava Investment Holdings LLC and Oh-So Fresh Food Service LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17125643. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4640-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Epic Produce Sales LLC. (Botta, Bart) (DLC)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Epic Produce Sales LLC. (Botta, Bart) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17125643 filed by Epic Produce Sales LLC. (Botta, Bart) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epic Produce Sales LLC v. Oh-So Fresh Food Service LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo M Nava
Represented By: Thomas Henry Allen
Represented By: Cody Douglas Vandewerker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nava Investment Holdings LLC
Represented By: Thomas Henry Allen
Represented By: Cody Douglas Vandewerker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oh-So Fresh Food Service LLC
Represented By: Thomas Henry Allen
Represented By: Cody Douglas Vandewerker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epic Produce Sales LLC
Represented By: Bart M Botta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?